This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 06:00:40 (UTC).

DAVID MESSIMORE AND MONICA MESSIMORE

Case Summary

On 12/23/2015 DAVID MESSIMORE AND MONICA MESSIMORE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Hill, Elizabeth M, Swope, V. Raymond, Esver-Poon, Samantha, Holt, Rachel E, HILL, Baskin, Liane, Cordova, Paula and V. RAYMOND SWOPE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1493

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Hill, Elizabeth M

Swope, V. Raymond

Esver-Poon, Samantha

Holt, Rachel E

HILL

Baskin, Liane

Cordova, Paula

V. RAYMOND SWOPE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MESSIMORE, DAVID

Respondent

MESSIMORE, MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

KRAL, VIVIAN L.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of.; Additional Info: Comment CHILD CUSTODY ORDER AFTER TRIAL (FILED 5/13 /2 O)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Comment CHILD CUSTODY ORDER AFTER TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, DAVID; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-011691-HOJ MONTALVO, STAJONNE M. $122.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, DAVID; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-011688-HOJ MONTALVO, STAJONNE M. $122.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketExhibit List Receipt.; Additional Info: Comment Received by Exhibit Technician.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, MONICA; Transaction Assessment $122.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, MONICA; Transaction Assessment $122.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, DAVID; Transaction Assessment $122.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, DAVID; Transaction Assessment $122.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
207 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2015
  • FinancialFinancial info for MESSIMORE, DAVID; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • FinancialFinancial; MESSIMORE, DAVID; Total Financial Assessment $1,224.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,224.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Petition - Dissolution with Minor Child File Date 12/23/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department for all purposes.; Additional Info: Comment APJFL3: CASE ASSIGNED TO DEPARTMENT 23 FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketNotice of ADR.; Additional Info: Comment NADR: NOTICE OF ADR FILED BY DAVID MESSIMORE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketDeclaration Under UCCJEA.; Additional Info: Comment DUCCJ: DECLARATION UNDER UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 151223-0306-CK 204/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2015
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage/Domestic Partnership.; Additional Info: Comment PDM: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAL, VIVIAN L.