This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/13/2023 at 07:00:35 (UTC).

DAVID LYON vs. CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2022 DAVID LYON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L, Greenberg, Susan and CHOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3614

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

Greenberg, Susan

CHOU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lyon, David

Defendants

Caltrans

DOES 1 TO 20

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LYON, DAVID E.

Defendant Attorney

WILGUS, DAVID S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Joint Case Management Statement.

Joint Case Management Statement

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement..

CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

Answer.

Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER ON DEMURRER Comment ORDER ON DEMURRER

Order.

Order Type: ON DEMURRERSigned by: JUDGE CHOUDate Signed: 03/10/2023 Comment Type: ON DEMURRER Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 03/10/2023

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received (AMENDED ORDER HAS BEEN SIGNED); ON DEMURRER Comment (AMENDED ORDER HAS BEEN SIGNED); ON DEMURRER

Hearing on Demurrer.

Original Type Hearing on Demurrer ~CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 03/09/2023 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Held Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SEC Comment TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER Comment MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition TO GENERAL DEMURRER Comment TO GENERAL DEMURRER

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DEMURRE Comment OF CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Demurrer to Amended Complaint.

Demurrer to Amended Complaint SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement.; Additional Info: Joint Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - no CMC statement..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - no CMC statement.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer.; Additional Info: Answer TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER ON DEMURRER Comment ORDER ON DEMURRER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: ON DEMURRERSigned by: JUDGE CHOUDate Signed: 03/10/2023 Comment Type: ON DEMURRER Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 03/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received (AMENDED ORDER HAS BEEN SIGNED); ON DEMURRER Comment (AMENDED ORDER HAS BEEN SIGNED); ON DEMURRER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketParty shall prepare formal order consistent w/order herein.; Additional Info: Comment David Lyon

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketTentative ruling adopted and becomes order:.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint.; Additional Info: First Amended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LYON, DAVID; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-032599-HOJ Lyon, David E $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for LYON, DAVID; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; LYON, DAVID; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less