This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/12/2018 09:16:56

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by David Drummond against Elena Marimo Berk in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXXXXX1845
  • Filing Date 07/14/2017
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction San Mateo County Superior Courts
  • Judge Franchi, Don R
  • Courthouse Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records
  • County San Mateo
  • State California

Party Details

  • Respondent Berk, Elena Marimo
  • Represented By
    • Hanson, Belinda
  • Petitioner Drummond, David
  • Represented By
    • Stross, Ellen Winick

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Party; Names: DRUMMOND DAVID; BERK, ELENA MARIMO; Comment; Comment; ().
  • 07/10/2018
  • Stipulation & Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure.
  • 07/10/2018
  • Appearance Stipulations and Waivers (Resp. already filed).
  • 07/10/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal. Additional Info: Comment Separation
  • 07/10/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed and mailed to all parties.
  • 07/10/2018
  • Judgment of Dissolution Entered.
  • 04/30/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed. Service Date: 12/15/17
  • 04/25/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of. Additional Info: Comment Preliminary Declaration of Disclosure and Income & Expense Declaration filed. Service Date: 4/19/18
  • 12/08/2017
  • Family Law Status Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Franchi Don R. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Off Calendar
  • 09/06/2017
  • Stipulation Fee Paid.
  • 09/06/2017
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Comment REGARDING RETROACTIVITYOF TEMPORARY SPOUSAL SUPPORT
  • 08/29/2017
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY JUDGE
  • 08/25/2017
  • Stipulation sent for signature to Department. Additional Info: Comment 15
  • 08/25/2017
  • Stipulation received.
  • 08/08/2017
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Comment / AND EMAIL - ELLEN WINICK STROSS/ RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; NOTICE OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION OPTIONS; AND DECLARATION UNDER CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA)
  • 08/04/2017
  • Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and Status Conference.
  • 08/04/2017
  • Notice of ADR.
  • 08/04/2017
  • Declaration Under UCCJEA. Additional Info: Comment Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction & Enforcement Act
  • 08/04/2017
  • Response & Request for. Additional Info: Comment Dissolution (Divorce) of Marriage/Domestic Partnership
  • 07/25/2017
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of. Additional Info: Comment & BELINDA HANSON ESQ. Family Law: Petition-Marriage/Domestic Partnership Summons, and blank Response-Marriage/Domestic Partnership

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.