This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/16/2022 at 01:03:58 (UTC).

DANIEL BIGGINS vs. VIRGINIA PALTER, et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 DANIEL BIGGINS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VIRGINIA PALTER. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Other - Stayed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3758

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIGGINS, DANIEL

Defendants

PALTER, VIRGINIA

DOES 1 to 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOROG, STEPHEN J

Defendant Attorneys

HART, LAWRENCE E

PATERSON, NAIRI

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees AND DEMAND FOR JURY Comment AND DEMAND FOR JURY

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer..

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip.

CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip

Notice of Change of Firm Name.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 01/12/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GOROG, STEPHEN J

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip.; Additional Info: CMC - Failure to Comply - 21 day Stip

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketOSC Needs to be set Failure to file Stip.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up ADR Stipulation Follow Up

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video.; Additional Info: Comment & Attorney Lance Burrow for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 01/12/2022 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: GOROG, STEPHEN J

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BIGGINS, DANIEL; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027932-HOJ BIGGINS, DANIEL $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for BIGGINS, DANIEL; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • FinancialFinancial; BIGGINS, DANIEL; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hart, Lawrence E

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATERSON, NAIRI