This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 00:09:12 (UTC).

DANA CAPPIELLO vs. INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 DANA CAPPIELLO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Swope, V. Raymond. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3739

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Swope, V. Raymond

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CAPPIELLO, DANA

ROES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.

DOES 1 - 25, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

ESHOO, GEORGE P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

VENTURA, ANTHONY F.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC Comment ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC

Answer.

Answer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division.

Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEE Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS OF SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ETC

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on LAI SAE Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on LAI SAEVANG AUTHORIZED AGENT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC Comment ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer. Additional Info: Answer TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-035340-HOJ INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Cross-Complaint File Date 08/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross Complaint. Additional Info: Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division. Additional Info: Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on LAI SAE Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET served on LAI SAEVANG AUTHORIZED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPPIELLO, DANA : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-027787-HOJ CAPPIELLO, DANA $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAPPIELLO, DANA : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: CAPPIELLO, DANA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERO REAL ESTATE SERVICES, INC., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VENTURA ANTHONY FRANK