Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/26/2021 at 15:38:41 (UTC).

Damont Richardson vs Pegasus Aviation Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 Damont Richardson filed an Other - Complex Tort/Class Action lawsuit against Pegasus Aviation Services, LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0292

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Complex Tort/Class Action

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richardson, Damont

Defendants

Pegasus Aviation Services, LLC

DOES 1 THRU 50, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DAVTYAN, EMIL

SZAMET, KELSEY M.

KINGSLEY, ERIC B

Defendant Attorney

HEARNE, HEATHER

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

Notice.

Notice OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AGREEMENT Comment OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AGREEMENT

Affidavit of Electronic Service.

Affidavit of Electronic Service CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order #2 Comment #2

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/15/2021 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

First Amended Complaint.

First Amended Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) General Denial Comment General Denial

Notice.

Notice OF SERVING COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 Comment OF SERVING COURT'S NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF A CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, AND COMPLEX FEES DUE served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Amended Notice Of.

Amended Notice Of COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTIN Comment COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF A CASE MANAGMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, AND COMPLEX FEES DUE

Notice.

Notice OF COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF A C Comment OF COURT'S NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES, DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE, SETTING OF A CASE MANAGEMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE, AND COMPLEX FEES DUE

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1 Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #1

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE Comment AND DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pegasus Aviation Services, LLC : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-016300-HOJ Pegasus Aviation Services, LLC $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Pegasus Aviation Services, LLC : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AGREEMENT Comment OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Electronic Service. Additional Info: Affidavit of Electronic Service CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2 Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order #2 Comment #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 04/15/2021 Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order #1 Comment #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes AND DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE Comment AND DESIGNATION AS COMPLEX CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Richardson, Damont : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-002499-HOJ Richardson, Damont $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Richardson, Damont : Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Richardson, Damont; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less