This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 21:48:33 (UTC).

Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC vs. The Children's Place, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against The Children's Place, Inc ,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4708

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

The Children's Place, Inc.

Does 1 through 25, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

RYAN, LELAND P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

QUAZZO, MARCO

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION (BOTH COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT) Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION (BOTH COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT)

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC; The Children's Place, Inc.; Does 1 through 25, inclusive; Comment: PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, ENTIRE ACTION IS DISMISSED (BOTH COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION (BOTH COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT) Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION (BOTH COMPLAINT AND CROSS-COMPLAINT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..; Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for The Children's Place, Inc.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-049704-HOJ The Children's Place, Inc. $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for The Children's Place, Inc.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; The Children's Place, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Cross-Complaint File Date 12/18/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Comment CMC 3/9/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-042073-HOJ Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; Daly City Serramonte Center, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE CHILDREN'S PLACE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUAZZO, MARCO