This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/05/2022 at 09:55:41 (UTC).

DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC vs. BED BATH & BEYOND, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BED BATH BEYOND, INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3725

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC

Defendant

BED BATH & BEYOND, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT, JEFFREY H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names; DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC; BED BATH & BEYOND, INC.; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CMC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-034187-HOJ DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DALY CITY SERRAMONTE CENTER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Bed Bath and Beyond is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT JEFFREY HARRISON