This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/21/2022 at 15:47:04 (UTC).

CYNTHIA KUHR, et al vs. Pablo Jaime, et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 CYNTHIA KUHR, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pablo Jaime,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5032

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KUHR, CYNTHIA

INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE D&C KUHR LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 12, 2008

KUHR, DENNIS

Defendants

Jaime, Pablo

Santellano, Soila B.

Citimortgage, Inc., a New York Corporation

Cenlar Capital Corporation, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation

Provident Credit Union, a California Non-Profit Credit Union

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OFFORD, SIMON

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, CMC NOTICE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, CMC NOTICE

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATI Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, CMC NOTICE SERVED TO: HEATHER HONG/ LEGAL SECRETARY

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATI Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, CMC NOTICE SERVED TO: HEATHER HONG/ LEGAL SECRETARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, CMC NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, ADR INFORMATION SHEET, CMC NOTICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KUHR, CYNTHIA; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-043042-HOJ Kuhr, Individually and as Trustee, Cynthia $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for KUHR, CYNTHIA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; KUHR, CYNTHIA; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENLAR CAPITAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PROVIDENT CREDIT UNION, a California nonprofit corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiMortgage, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OFFORD, SIMON