This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/23/2022 at 00:51:35 (UTC).

CRYSTAL NUSOM vs. ADAM SMITH, et al

Case Summary

On 03/11/2022 CRYSTAL NUSOM filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ADAM SMITH,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1093

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NUSOM, CRYSTAL

Defendants

SMITH, ADAM

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSEN, BRIAN L.

Defendant Attorney

WALSH, CATHERINE A.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Remote Appearance.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer..

CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; NUSOM, CRYSTAL; SMITH, ADAM; DOES 1 TO 10; Comment: FILED ON 8/4/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Meet and confer..; Additional Info: CMC - At issue - Meet and confer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SMITH, ADAM; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-023433-HOJ SMITH, ADAM $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for SMITH, ADAM; Transaction Assessment $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; SMITH, ADAM; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NUSOM, CRYSTAL; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-009696-HOJ Nusom, Crystal $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for NUSOM, CRYSTAL; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; NUSOM, CRYSTAL; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH, CATHERINE A.