This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 00:06:40 (UTC).

CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, vs. W.I. DEVELOPMENT SITES LLC,, et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2020 CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against W I DEVELOPMENT SITES LLC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y., Chou, Danny Y, Reyna, Renee C and Halperin, Ernst A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2505

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Chou, Danny Y.

Chou, Danny Y

Reyna, Renee C

Halperin, Ernst A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC,

Defendants

W.I. DEVELOPMENT SITES LLC,

PTI US ACQUISITIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIU, KEVIN

Defendant Attorney

TARLOW, DAVID N

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET BY SERVING LYNANN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET BY SERVING LYNANNE GARES

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET BY SERVING RIN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET BY SERVING RINALDO COCITO DIRECTOR

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Order.

Order STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/02/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LIU, KEVINDefendantAttorney: TARLOW, DAVID N

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 6/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 6/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 03/01/2021 Judicial Officer Reyna Renee C. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LIU, KEVINDefendantAttorney: TARLOW, DAVID N

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC - 3/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF Comment CMC - 3/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. SSF

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder. Additional Info: Order STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-032841-HOJ CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, : Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 8/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/02/2021 Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PlaintiffAttorney: LIU, KEVINDefendantAttorney: TARLOW, DAVID N

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference Case Management Conference - 6/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Comment Case Management Conference - 6/2/2021 at 9:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketParty appeared by audio and/or video. Additional Info: Comment Added by automated script

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET BY SERVING RIN Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET BY SERVING RINALDO COCITO DIRECTOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-023877-HOJ CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC, : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: CROWN CASTLE TOWERS 06-2 LLC,; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LIU KEVIN L