Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 01:09:29 (UTC).

CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY vs. TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY, et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Etezadi, Susan I., Weiner, Marie S., Grandsaert, John L. and Davis, III, Leland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5650

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Etezadi, Susan I.

Weiner, Marie S.

Grandsaert, John L.

Davis, III, Leland

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Respondents

CITY COUNCIL OF THE TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, ITS GOVERNING BODY

TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY

DOES 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHONAFELT, MICHAEL W

Respondent Attorney

GILPIN, JAMES B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference.

*CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 02/28/2019 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 02:00 PM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SHONAFELT, MICHAEL W

Answer.

Answer TO PETITION AND COMPLAINT Comment TO PETITION AND COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC'S Comment CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC'S

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 AND ORDER FOR PERMISSIVE E-FILING Comment CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER # 1 AND ORDER FOR PERMISSIVE E-FILING

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Comment OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.

Demurrer to.

Demurrer to PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Comment PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

Notice of Related Case.

Notice of Related Case 3:18-CV-02473-JSC Comment 3:18-CV-02473-JSC

Petition for Writ of Mandate.

Petition for Writ of Mandate

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing CMO #2 and Order Setting Court Trial Comment CMO #2 and Order Setting Court Trial

Hearing on Demurrer.

*CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 01/25/2019 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 03:00 PM Result Held Comment TO THE COMPLAINT Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SHONAFELT, MICHAEL W

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Order #1 and Order for Permissive E-Filing.

Case Management Order #1 and Order for Permissive E-Filing

Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Complex Litigation Designation.

Clerk's Notice of Fees Due Complex Litigation Designation

Order Designating Case as Complex.

Order Designating Case as Complex

Proof of Service by PUBLICATION of.

Proof of Service by PUBLICATION of SUMMONS Comment SUMMONS

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed AMENDED Comment AMENDED

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

33 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • Court Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Comment 3 day estimate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 08/02/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Result Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing CMO #4 Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference Comment CMO #4 Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Order. Additional Info: Case Management Order CMO #4 Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference Comment CMO #4 Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Master Calendar to set MSC date accordingly and send notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 05/07/2019 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present PetitionerAttorney: SHONAFELT, MICHAEL WRespondentAttorney: GILPIN, JAMES B.RespondentAttorney: GILPIN, JAMES B.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement RESPONDENTS AND DEFENDANTS TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH'S AND CITY COUNCIL OF THE Comment RESPONDENTS AND DEFENDANTS TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH'S AND CITY COUNCIL OF THE TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • Financial: CITY COUNCIL OF THE TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, ITS GOVERNING BODY; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Financial info for TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Financial info for TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY : Government Exemption $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Financial info for TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY : Transaction Assessment $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Financial: TOWN OF HILLSBOROUGH, A CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITY; Total Financial Assessment $1,090.00; Total Payments and Credits $90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • Financial info for CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Financial info for CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-068626-HOJ OAKLAND SERVICE OF PROCESS, INC. $1435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Financial info for CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $1000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Financial info for CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Financial: CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; Total Financial Assessment $2,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN CASTLE NG WEST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James B Gilpin