This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/06/2023 at 00:43:31 (UTC).

Cristina Velaro vs. Seth Artea, et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2022 Cristina Velaro filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Seth Artea,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mau, Michael L and Weiner, Marie S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5085

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mau, Michael L

Weiner, Marie S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velaro, Cristina

Defendants

Artea, Seth

Artea, Christine

DOES 1 THROUGH X, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREKHUS, MATTHEW D

Defendant Attorney

HIRSIG, PETER J.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Answer (Unlimited).

70314Answer4300c54e7 Comment Answer to Complaint

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

70314NoticeCo01fdf91

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Artea, Christine; Transaction Assessment $150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Artea, Christine; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Artea, Christine; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-003890-HOJ Artea, Christine $1020.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; Artea, Christine; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for Artea, Seth; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; Artea, Seth; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer to Complaint Comment Answer to Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Velaro, Cristina; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-043612-HOJ Velaro, Cristina $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Velaro, Cristina; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Velaro, Cristina; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/02/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less