Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/07/2021 at 00:01:16 (UTC).

Crisostomo Tarongoy, et al vs. Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Crisostomo Tarongoy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3973

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tarongoy, Crisostomo

Tarongoy, Amelia

Defendants

Burlington Coat Factory Direct Corporation

DOES 1 TO 65

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMPANO, SALVATORE C

 

Court Documents

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; DEMAND FOR J Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL served on CARLOS PAZ AUTHORIZED AGENT

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement AMENDED Comment AMENDED

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Demand For Jury Trial.

Demand for Jury Trial

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer..

CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.. Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; DEMAND FOR J Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF JURY FEE DEPOSIT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL served on CARLOS PAZ AUTHORIZED AGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement AMENDED Comment AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement. Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tarongoy, Crisostomo : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-005125-HOJ Tarongoy, Crisostomo $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tarongoy, Crisostomo : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees. Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand For Jury Trial. Additional Info: Demand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.. Additional Info: CMC - Not at issue - no service/default/answer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Comment CMC 2/1/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tarongoy, Crisostomo : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036315-HOJ Tarongoy, Crisostomo $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Tarongoy, Crisostomo : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Tarongoy, Crisostomo; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BURLINGTON COAT FACTORY DIRECT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMPANO, SALVATORE C