This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:18:24 (UTC).

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO,ETAL VS KUMARI JUDGE

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 COUNTY OF SAN MATEO,ETAL filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KUMARI JUDGE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4887

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO,

COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Defendants

KUMARI JUDGE

OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FOR DORTHY NYCE

JUDGE, KUMARI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITLOCK, EUGENE

Defendant Attorney

KARLSTEN, MELISSA R

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION Comment SO2: STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUE TRIAL AND DISCOVERY DEADLINES SIGNED BY ROBERT D. FOILES ON 09/20/13.

Conversion Hearing.

HEARING NOTICE Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 1 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN MATEO.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

General Denial filed.

DENIAL Comment GD: (S) GENERAL DENIAL TO THE COMPLAINT OF COUNTY OF SAN MATEO FILED BY KUMARI JUDGE, REPRESENTED BY MELISSA R KARLSTEN

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: JUDGE KUMARI; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: COUNTY OF SAN MATEO, A POLITICAL SUBDIVISION OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY JENNIFER ARNOTT ON 01/29/14.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WAS FILED AND ENTERED ON 01/24/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment JCR1: HONORABLE ROBERT D. FOILES, JUDGE PRESIDING. CLERK: JENNIFER ARNOTT. COURT REPORTER: NONE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 1 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Court Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 1 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY JENNIFER ARNOTT ON 09/30/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HC: HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/30/14 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT PJ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: STIPULATION & ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL WAS SIGNED AND FILED ON 09/20/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Financial info for JUDGE, KUMARI : Case Payment Receipt # 201309230744 JUDGE, KUMARI $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2013
  • Financial info for JUDGE, KUMARI : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Financial info for JUDGE, KUMARI : Case Payment Receipt # 201208010676 JUDGE, KUMARI $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Financial info for JUDGE, KUMARI : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2012
  • Financial: JUDGE, KUMARI; Total Financial Assessment $495.00; Total Payments and Credits $495.00

    Read MoreRead Less