This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 05:05:01 (UTC).

CORAZON PAED ET AL VS COUNTRYWIDE BANK NA ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2010 CORAZON PAED filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against COUNTRYWIDE BANK NA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Dylina, Steven L, Bergeron, Joseph E, Swope, V Raymond, Swope, V. Raymond and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1696

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Dylina, Steven L

Bergeron, Joseph E

Swope, V Raymond

Swope, V. Raymond

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PAED, GENARO Q

PAED, CORAZON Q

FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY

WALKS WITH SPIRIT CORPORATION an entity of form unknown

NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HMW

GJZ GROUP

CPC DUNDEE TRUST created under/by SHON-TE-EAST-A

AGUIRRE, MARCO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC a Delaware corporation

COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE COMPANY

COUNTRYWIDE BANK NA.

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

FRIED, JONATHAN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

JULIAN, JASON M

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

COMPLAINT (5) Comment ACS: (U) 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAED FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Ex Parte.

APPLICATION Comment EPA: EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' ACTION FOR FAILURE TO TIMELY AMEND FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A.

Order.

ORDER Comment O2: ORDER SUSTAINING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER WITH LEAVE TO AMEND SIGNED BY JUDGE BERGERON ON 11/26/12 FILED.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Conversion Action.

COMPLAINT (4) Comment ACS: (U) 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAED FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request for Dismissal of - WITHOUT prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDC: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A..

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A..

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSMN: PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF DEFTS NTC OF DEM/DEM; MEMO P&A ETC SERVED ON CORAZON Q PAED GENARO Q PAED FILED. DATE OF MAILING 07/12/12.

Conversion Action.

DEMURRER Comment DEM: (S) DEMURRER TO 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAED FILED BY COUNTRYWIDE BANK NA. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. REPRESENTED BY JASON M JULIAN

Opposition.

OPPOSITION Comment OPP: OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER OF AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CORAZON Q PAED GENARO Q PAED

Conversion Action.

(U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAED FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT) Comment ACS: (U) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PAED FILED (AMENDED COMPLAINT)

Conversion Action.

(S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST Comment CC: (S) CROSS-COMPLAINT OF BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A. FILED

Complaint.

(S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: GJZ GROUP; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PAED GENARO Q; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: AGUIRRE, MARCO; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HMW; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: WALKS WITH SPIRIT CORPORATION an entity of form unknown; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CPC DUNDEE TRUST created under/by SHON-TE-EAST-A; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PAED, CORAZON Q; Comment: 0002 CROSS-COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE COMPANY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: COUNTRYWIDE BANK NA.; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PAED GENARO Q; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: PAED, CORAZON Q; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2013
  • Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment CODWO: CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC AND ALL PARTIES DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITHOUT prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDC: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF CROSS-COMPLAINT OF MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN ITS ENTIRETY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE (2) Comment N2: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANTS AND AGAINST PLAINTIFFS FILED BY BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130130-0563-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment EXFEE: EX-PARTE FEE PAID BY BANK OF AMERICA N.A., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYS INC, RECONTRUST COMPANY, N.A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130130-0561-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
169 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2011
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment PSQS: PROOF OF SERVICE (QUESTIONABLE SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PAED AS TO COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE COMPANY FILED. SERVICE QUESTIONABLE BECAUSE NO DATE OF SERVICE PROVIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment PSQS: PROOF OF SERVICE (QUESTIONABLE SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PAED AS TO RECONTRUST COMPANY FILED. SERVICE QUESTIONABLE BECAUSE NO DATE OF SERVICE PROVIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2011
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment PSQS: PROOF OF SERVICE (QUESTIONABLE SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF PAED AS TO BANK OF AMERICA FILED. SERVICE QUESTIONABLE BECAUSE NO DATE OF SERVICE PROVIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Fee Waiver Granted. Additional Info: Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY GENARO Q PAED GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $395.00 SIGNED BY JUDGE CRETAN ON 12/23/10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/20/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • Request to Waive Court Fees. Additional Info: Comment APWF: APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY GENARO Q PAED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where FIRST AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY, A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where RECONTRUST COMPANY N.A is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant