Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/17/2021 at 00:29:55 (UTC).

Control Fire, Inc. vs. Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. a California corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 Control Fire, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Michael Roberts Construction, Inc a California corporation. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Chou, Danny Y. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2207

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Chou, Danny Y

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Control Fire, Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC. a Delaware limited liability company

Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. a California corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINGHART, ANDREW D.

Defendant Attorneys

STEYER, ALLEN

KORBEL, GREGORY J

 

Court Documents

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Order.

Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Complaint.

Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Chou Danny Y. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. a California corporation : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-021692-HOJ Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. a California corporation $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. a California corporation : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Michael Roberts Construction, Inc. a California corporation; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT Comment Answer to COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing. Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder. Additional Info: Order ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment ORDER DEEMING CASES RELATED; and REASSIGNMENT OF JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC. a Delaware limited liability company : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-019456-HOJ AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC. a Delaware limited liability company $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for AIMCO Leahy Square Apartments, LLC. a Delaware limited liability company : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Control Fire, Inc. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-014932-HOJ Control Fire, Inc. $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Control Fire, Inc. : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Control Fire, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEIZE FIRE, INC., a California corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where MICHAEL ROBERTS CONSTRUCTION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEYER ALLAN ESQ.