This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:07:53 (UTC).

CONNIE OANH VUONG VS ALBERT MAR

Case Summary

On 06/25/2012 CONNIE OANH VUONG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALBERT MAR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Dylina, Steven L and Dylina, Steven L.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4814

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Dylina, Steven L

Dylina, Steven L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONNIE OANH VUONG

VUONG, CONNIE OANH

Defendants

ALBERT MAR

MAR, ALBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOWLER, EMILY

Defendant Attorney

MERTES, MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES FILED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (2) Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Conversion Hearing.

CMC NOTICE Judicial Officer Dylina Steven L Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF JURY FEES DEPOSIT FILED BY CONNIE OANH VUONG.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT (2) Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CONNIE OANH VUONG.

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ALBERT MAR.

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

ANSWER Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT OF VUONG FILED BY ALBERT MAR REPRESENTED BY MARTIN MERTES

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: MAR ALBERT; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: VUONG, CONNIE OANH; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL CASE SETTLED AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 18 2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2013
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 7 OSC RE: DISMISSAL CASE SETTLED AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON APRIL 18 2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY LORRAINE ON 04/18/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: CASE SETTLED AT THE MSC ON APRIL 18 2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2013
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Off Calendar Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE SIGNED BY JUDGE DYLINA AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY LORRAINE ON 04/18/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial info for MAR, ALBERT : Case Payment Receipt # 201209260136 MAR, ALBERT $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial info for MAR, ALBERT : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial info for MAR, ALBERT : Case Payment Receipt # 201209260125 MAR, ALBERT $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial info for MAR, ALBERT : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • Financial: MAR, ALBERT; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Financial info for VUONG, CONNIE OANH : Case Payment Receipt # 201210250519 VUONG, CONNIE OANH $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • Financial info for VUONG, CONNIE OANH : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for VUONG, CONNIE OANH : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270707 VUONG, CONNIE OANH $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for VUONG, CONNIE OANH : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: VUONG, CONNIE OANH; Total Financial Assessment $545.00; Total Payments and Credits $545.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

Martin W. Mertes STATE BAR NO. 71941

MACMORRIS & CARBONEATTORNEYS ATLAW SAN MATEO COUNTY

1735 TECHNOLOGY DRIVE, SUITE 500 SAN JOSE, CA 95110

(408) 392-8654 ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT ALBERT MART

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

UNLIMITED CIVIL JURISDICTION

CONNIE OAHN VUONG, Case No. CIV514814 Plaintiff, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT V.

ALBERT MAR AND DOES 1 TO 30, Defendants.

COMES NOW defendant Albert Mart and answers the complaint on file herein as follows:

1. Under the provisions of Section 431.30 of the Code of Civil Procedure of the State of California, this answering defendant generally denies each and every allegation of the complaint, and the whole thereof, and further denies that plaintiff has been or is now or will be damaged to the extent alleged or to any other extent.

AS AND FOR FURTHER, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWERING DEFENDANT AVERS:

FIRST AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

2. The incident or incidents complained of by plaintiff herein were caused, in whole or in part, by the negligence of the plaintiff. Any recovery by plaintiff in this case must be reduced by that percentage of the plaintiff's negligence which contributed to the incident or

incidents.

SECOND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

3. Plaintiff failed to use reasonable care to mitigate, in whole or in part, the damages alleged in the complaint.

THIRD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

4. Damages complained of by plaintiff herein were caused, in whole or in part, by acts and omissions of persons other than this answering defendant, which other personsnamed as defendants in this action. This answering defendant should only be required to pay that portion of the plaintiff's damages attributable to this answering defendant pursuant to Civil Code sections 1431.2 and/or 1432.

FOURTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

5. The complaint and/or causes of action therein are barred by the applicable statute of limitations, specifically including but not limited to California Code of Civil Procedure sections 335.1; 337; 338(a),(b),(c),(d) and (j); and 339.

FIFTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

6. The complaint and/or causes of action therein fail to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action against this answering defendant. WHEREFORE, defendant prays: 1. That plaintiff take nothing; 2. For costs of suit herein; and 3. For such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper. DATED: September 14,2012 MACMORRIS & CARBONE

Martin W. Mertcfs ) Attorneys for De@dafit Albert Mart

Martin W. Mertcfs ) Attorneys for De@dafit Albert Mart Vuong v. Mar San Mateo County Superior Court Case No. CIV514814

Vuong v. Mar San Mateo County Superior Court Case No. CIV514814

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

I, Kerry R. Bustamante, am employed by the office of MacMorris & Carbone in County of Santa Clara at 1735 Technology Drive, Suite 500, San Jose, CA 95110. I am over the age of 18 years and am not a party to this action.

I am readily familiar with my employer's business practice for collection and processing of correspondence for mailing with the United States Postal Service. Correspondence so collected and processed is deposited with the United States Postal Service the same day it is placed for collection in the ordinary course of business. I served the accompanying ANSWER TO COMPLAINT by placing the document(s) for collection and mailing on the date below, following ordinary business practices at the above business address of my employer, in a sealed envelope or envelopes, with postage fully paid, and addressed to:

Emily Fowler, Esq.

DUNNING LAW FIRM

2000 Van Ness Avenue, Suite 602 San Francisco, CA 94109

I declare under penalty of perjury under the laws of the State of California that the

foregoing is true and correct.

patet: (- 2|2

Kerry R. Bustamante