Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 19:49:30 (UTC).

RE: 185 LINDEN AVE, SAN BRUNO, CA 94066

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 RE 185 LINDEN AVE, SAN BRUNO, CA 94066 was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1848

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Clear Recon Corp

Respondent

All Claimants to Surplus Funds of Real Property

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RANKIN, CASPER J.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS served on Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS Comment TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDI Comment PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE served on SEE SERVICE LIST

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF ALLOWING DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS Comment OF ALLOWING DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS

Notice.

Notice OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS Comment OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re Comment PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS Comment PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

Petition.

Petition AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS O Comment AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketMotion RE: Appl for Dist of Undist Surplus of Proceeds of TS. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS served on Comment NOTICE OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes. Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Received. Additional Info: Proposed Order Received TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS Comment TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDI Comment PETITION AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE served on SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support. Additional Info: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF ALLOWING DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS Comment OF ALLOWING DEPOSIT OF SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice. Additional Info: Notice OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS Comment OF PETITION TO SUPERIOR COURT TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clear Recon Corp : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2021-013364-HOJ Clear Recon Corp $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial info for Clear Recon Corp : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialFinancial: Clear Recon Corp; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Petition File Date 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing re. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing re Comment PETITION TO DEPOSIT SURPLUS FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition. Additional Info: Petition AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS O Comment AND DECLARATION REGARDING UNRESOLVED CLAIMS AND DEPOSIT OF UNDISTRIBUTED SURPLUS PROCEEDS OF TRUSTEE'S SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clear Recon Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RANKIN, CASPER J.