This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 03/28/2022 at 18:14:00 (UTC).

CLAUDIA GONZALEZ vs. REMY'S QUALITY CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 CLAUDIA GONZALEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against REMY'S QUALITY CONSTRUCTION, INC , a California corporation. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L., Karesh, Jonathan E., Grandsaert, John L and Karesh, Jonathan E. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0915

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L.

Karesh, Jonathan E.

Grandsaert, John L

Karesh, Jonathan E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ, CLAUDIA

Defendants

DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE

REMY'S QUALITY CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation

SIJBRANT, REMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCQUAID, MORIA C.

Defendant Attorney

WALLACE, ROBERT F

 

Court Documents

Notice of referral to ADR and Notice to file Stipulation and.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Notice of referral to ADR and Notice to file Stipulation and.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

Notice of referral to ADR and Notice to file Stipulation and.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR SESSION DATE: 10/7 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Comment SESSION DATE: 10/7

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of JOHN DOE- PERSON IN CHARGE OF OFFICE COMPLAINTL; COVER S Comment JOHN DOE- PERSON IN CHARGE OF OFFICE COMPLAINTL; COVER SHEET; SUMMONS; NOTICE OF CMC

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CAS Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ADR PACKET Served on REMY J SIBRANT, PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR SESSION DATE: 10/7 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Comment SESSION DATE: 10/7

Return Letter Re: Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Return Letter Re: Stipulation and Order to ADR MISSING DATE OF ADR SESSION Comment MISSING DATE OF ADR SESSION

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral ADR Referral ADR Referral Comment Order to ADR within 21 days

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Conference.

~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 06/14/2019 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement CMC 6/14 Comment CMC 6/14

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Karesh Jonathan E. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal Comment JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names; GONZALEZ, CLAUDIA; REMY'S QUALITY CONSTRUCTION, INC., a California corporation; SIJBRANT, REMY; DOES 1-50, INCLUSIVE; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Comment With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR SESSION DATE: 10/7 Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Comment SESSION DATE: 10/7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept.; Additional Info: Comment 11 SENT FOR SIGNATURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Docket10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn Letter Re: Stipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Return Letter Re: Stipulation and Order to ADR MISSING DATE OF ADR SESSION Comment MISSING DATE OF ADR SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CAS Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ADR PACKET Served on REMY J SIBRANT, PERSON AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for GONZALEZ, CLAUDIA; Case Payment Receipt # 2019-009612-HOJ ONE LEGAL $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial info for GONZALEZ, CLAUDIA; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • FinancialFinancial; GONZALEZ, CLAUDIA; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALLACE, ROBERT F.