This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:35 (UTC).

CITIBANK VS STEVEN HALL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CITIBANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEVEN HALL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4888

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendants

STEVEN M HALL

HALL, STEVEN M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOORE, HARVEY M

 

Court Documents

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CITIBANK NA AS TO STEVEN M HALL.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CITIBANK NA AS TO STEVEN M HALL BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: CITIBANK NA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Default Entered; Party; Name: HALL STEVEN M; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2013
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment COMM: JUDGMENT PACKET RECEIVED 10/16/12 RETURNED TO ATTY MOORE - REQ FOR DISM FILED ON 3/20/13 - SEE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Judgment Received. Additional Info: Comment JR: JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment DE: DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO STEVEN M HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to enter default filed. Additional Info: REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CITIBANK NA AS TO STEVEN M HALL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CITIBANK NA AS TO STEVEN M HALL BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 07/16/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0065-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CITIBANK NA : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270065 CITIBANK NA $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CITIBANK NA : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CITIBANK NA; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less