Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:43:16 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. RAMON AVILA

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RAMON AVILA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2807

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

AVILA, RAMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 4/21/20 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 4/21/20

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT-CONTRACT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT-CONTRACT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Party; Names: CITIBANK N.A.; AVILA, RAMON; Comment: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal: 4/21/20 Comment OSC re Dismissal: 4/21/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT-CONTRACT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT-CONTRACT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CITIBANK, N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037401-HOJ WONG, JENNIFER $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CITIBANK, N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less