This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/10/2023 at 01:44:25 (UTC).

CITIBANK, N.A. vs. JASMIN MELCAR

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 CITIBANK, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASMIN MELCAR. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0819

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendant

MELCAR, JASMIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COX, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint.

Complaint

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT; SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment COMPLAINT; SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of COMPLAINT; SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment COMPLAINT; SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CITIBANK, N.A.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-006084-HOJ Citibank, N.A. $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial info for CITIBANK, N.A.; Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialFinancial; CITIBANK, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/23/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less