Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 22:58:51 (UTC).

Citibank, N.A. vs. Greg Moyer

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Citibank, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Greg Moyer. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3971

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Citibank, N.A.

Defendant

Moyer, Greg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ISOZAKI, RYOTA

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal.

Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 6/7/22 Comment OSC re Dismissal 6/7/22

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case COPY FORWARDED TO CMC CLERK Comment COPY FORWARDED TO CMC CLERK

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Re: OSC Re: Dismissal OSC re Dismissal 6/7/22 Comment OSC re Dismissal 6/7/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case COPY FORWARDED TO CMC CLERK Comment COPY FORWARDED TO CMC CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Citibank, N.A. : eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2020-036299-HOJ Citibank, N.A. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for Citibank, N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • FinancialFinancial: Citibank, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 09/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ISOZAKI RYOTA