This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 05/08/2022 at 00:01:25 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER R. GUIDO, et al vs. RAHNEL WOLFE, et al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 CHRISTOPHER R GUIDO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RAHNEL WOLFE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A., MIRAM, Grandsaert, John L., Weiner, Marie S., Weiner, Marie S, Halperin, Ernst A, Grandsaert, John L and Miram, George A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1427

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

MIRAM

Judges

Miram, George A.

Grandsaert, John L.

Weiner, Marie S.

Weiner, Marie S

Halperin, Ernst A

Grandsaert, John L

Miram, George A

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

GUIDO, MARIA NORA

GUIDO, CHRISTOPHER R.

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

DOES 1 THROUGH 50, INCLUSIVE

WOLFE, RAHNEL

WOLFE, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

BELL, SHADAE S

WASSERMAN, DAVID P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LONG, SCOTT D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 11/6/20 Comment CMC 11/6/20

Answer.

Answer ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT Comment ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF GREGORY KLINGSPORN RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDE Comment OF GREGORY KLINGSPORN RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION; ETC.

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION; ETC. Comment FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION; ETC.

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support OF RAHNEL WOLFE RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND Comment OF RAHNEL WOLFE RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND OSC RE: PRELIMINARY INJUCTION; ETC.

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

ADR Referral.

ADR Referral

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 11/6/20 Comment CMC 11/6/20

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Order.

Notice of Entry of Order

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • Docket1st Time Extension Granted for ADR Compliance.; Additional Info: Comment Until 06/07/2022 per Stip/o to ADR filed 12/08/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order to ADR.; Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADR Referral.; Additional Info: ADR Referral

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address of Attorney.; Additional Info: Notice of Change of Address of Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCMC - At issue - Referral to ADR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference CMC 11/6/20 Comment CMC 11/6/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement.; Additional Info: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Summons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Amended Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for GUIDO, CHRISTOPHER R.; Case Payment Receipt # 2020-013124-HOJ S&r SERVICES $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial info for GUIDO, CHRISTOPHER R.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialFinancial; GUIDO, CHRISTOPHER R.; Total Financial Assessment $475.00; Total Payments and Credits $475.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 03/05/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WASSERMAN, DAVID P.