This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/15/2022 at 01:14:36 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN, ET AL VS FRED GARCIA, ETAL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FRED GARCIA, ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Etezadi, Susan I and ROBERT D. FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7194

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Etezadi, Susan I

ROBERT D. FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHANSEN, SUSANNE

JOHANSEN, CHRISTOPHER

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GARCIA, FRED

GARCIA, VINCENT

GARCIA, ALICIA REENEE

Cross Defendants

GUTIERREZ, HUGO

DELOSANGELES, MA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRYE, JOHN N.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELEY, P. CHRISTIAN

Cross Defendant Attorney

FEENEY, THOMAS J.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRED GARCIA ALICIA REENEE GARCIA, VINCENT GARCIA. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRED GARCIA, ALICIA REENEE GARCIA, VINCENT GARCIA.

Summons Issued / Filed.

30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

Notice.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN SUSANNE JOHANSEN. Comment N: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN, SUSANNE JOHANSEN.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF JOHANSEN AS TO FRED GARCIA BY SUB-SERVI Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF JOHANSEN AS TO FRED GARCIA, BY SUB-SERVING ALICIA GARCIA - CO-DEFENDANT. MAILING DATE OF 02/07/16.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GARCIA AS TO HUGO GUTIERREZ BY SU Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GARCIA AS TO HUGO GUTIERREZ, BY SUB-SERVING MA DELOSANGELES GUTIERREZ. MAILING DATE OF 04/19/16.

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY With Prejudice Comment AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY, With Prejudice

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Answer / Response / Denial - Unlimited.

(S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GARCIA FILED BY HUGO GUTIERREZ MA DELOSANGELES, REPRESENTED BY TH Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GARCIA FILED BY HUGO GUTIERREZ, MA DELOSANGELES, REPRESENTED BY THOMAS J. FEENEY

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FRED GARCIA Comment WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FRED GARCIA

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal AS TO COMPLAINT ONLYWith Prejudice Comment AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY, With Prejudice

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR.

10 Day Reminder Notice to file Stipulation and Order to ADR

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement MARIA DELOSANGELES GUTIERREZ Comment MARIA DELOSANGELES GUTIERREZ

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRED GARCIA ALICIA REENEE GARCIA, VINCENT GARCIA. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY FRED GARCIA, ALICIA REENEE GARCIA, VINCENT GARCIA.

Answer (Unlimited).

(S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GARCIA FILED BY HUGO GUTIERREZ MA DELOSANGELES, REPRESENTED BY TH Comment ANS: (S) ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT OF GARCIA FILED BY HUGO GUTIERREZ, MA DELOSANGELES, REPRESENTED BY THOMAS J. FEENEY

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN SUSANNE JOHANSEN. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTOPHER JOHANSEN, SUSANNE JOHANSEN.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment 10 DAY JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketMandatory Settlement Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment: (CROSS COMPLAINT OF GARCIA DISMISSED PER REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED 10-13-16)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FRED GARCIA Comment WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CROSS COMPLAINT OF FRED GARCIA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment: (PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 10/05/16)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest For Dismissal.; Additional Info: Request For Dismissal AS TO COMPLAINT ONLYWith Prejudice Comment AS TO COMPLAINT ONLY, With Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17 Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • DocketNotice of Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing 1/10/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement of Entire Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case Type: Conditional Comment Type: Conditional

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF JOHANSEN AS TO VINCENT GARCIA BY SUB-SE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF JOHANSEN AS TO VINCENT GARCIA, BY SUB-SERVING ALICIA GARCIA - CO-DEFENDANT. MAILING DATE OF 02/07/16.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHANSEN, CHRISTOPHER; Case Payment Receipt # 201602010436 JOHANSEN, CHRISTOPHER $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for JOHANSEN, CHRISTOPHER; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; JOHANSEN, CHRISTOPHER; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 02/01/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160201-0436-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRYE, JOHN NORMAN