This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:12:57 (UTC).

CHRISTINE A. O'KEEFE VS RICK ROGERS,ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE filed an Other lawsuit against RICK ROGERS,ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Miram, George A and Miram, George A.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4913

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Miram, George A

Miram, George A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE

O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A

Defendants

RICK ROGERS

AMANDA WILLIAMS

WILLIAM LONG

WILLIAMS, AMANDA

ROGERS, RICK

LONG, WILLIAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOTELO, GINGER L

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

NOTICE (4) Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF O'KEEFE AS TO RICK ROGERS FILED. SIGNED BY: GREGORY ANTONE. DATE SIGNED: 07/24/12

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

NOTICE (2) Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF O'KEEFE AS TO WILLIAM LONG FILED. SIGNED BY: GREGORY ANTONE. DATE SIGNED: 07/24/12

Motion.

NOTICE Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION FILED BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

NOTICE (3) Comment NAR: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF O'KEEFE AS TO AMANDA WILLIAMS FILED. SIGNED BY: GREGORY ANTONE. DATE SIGNED: 07/24/12

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF CHRISTINE A. O'KEEFE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Stipulation & Order.

STIPULATION Comment SO: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE.

Notice.

NOTICE (5) Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE.

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed.

MEMO Comment MPA: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF GINGER L. SOTELO IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Ex Parte Application.

APPLICATION Comment EXP: EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request.

REQUEST Comment REQ: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIPULATION FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER SERVED ON GREGORY J. ANTONE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/13/12.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: LONG WILLIAM; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: WILLIAMS, AMANDA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: ROGERS, RICK; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment POSI: PROOF OF SERVICE OF STIPULATION FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER SERVED ON GREGORY J. ANTONE BY PERSONAL DELIVERY WITH A SERVICE DATE OF 08/13/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice. Additional Info: NOTICE (5) Comment N: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120829-0491-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment EXFEE: EX-PARTE FEE PAID BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120823-0432-CK 036/ 60.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Conversion Action. Additional Info: Comment EXFEE: EX-PARTE FEE PAID BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation & Order. Additional Info: STIPULATION Comment SO: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR MUTUAL STAY AWAY ORDER FILED BY CHRISTINE A O'KEEFE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Application. Additional Info: APPLICATION Comment EXP: EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0098-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Case Payment Receipt # 201208290491 O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Case Payment Receipt # 201208230432 O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Case Payment Receipt # 201208130676 O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280520 O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Transaction Assessment $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280098 O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A : Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: O'KEEFE, CHRISTINE A; Total Financial Assessment $615.00; Total Payments and Credits $615.00

    Read MoreRead Less