This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/17/2022 at 20:05:50 (UTC).

CHRISTINA CLIMER VS RILEY MANFORD ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2012 CHRISTINA CLIMER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RILEY MANFORD ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and ROBERT D. FOILES. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4692

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

ROBERT D. FOILES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLIMER, CHRISTINA

Defendants

DEVEREUX, LACEY

MANFORD, RILEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HASSELL, DAWN L.

Defendant Attorney

FEENEY, THOMAS J.

 

Court Documents

Conversion Action.

ARBITRATION (2) Comment ACOA: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 11/27/12. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEARING DATE: 02/19/13.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Case Management Statement.

STATEMENT Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE (3) Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER

Conversion Action.

ARBITRATION Comment NPAP1: NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS PRINTED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator.

NOTICE Comment NAA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CLIMER SERVED ON LACEY DEVEREUX WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/22/12.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (2) Comment NRA: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR ROLANDO PASQUALI FILED BY RILEY MANFORD LACEY DEVEREUX

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER

Conversion Action.

APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 11/27/12. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEAR Comment ACOA: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 11/27/12. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEARING DATE: 02/19/13.

Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator.

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED Comment NAA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR ROLANDO PASQUALI FILED BY RILEY MANFORD LACEY DEVEREUX Comment NRA: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR ROLANDO PASQUALI FILED BY RILEY MANFORD, LACEY DEVEREUX

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS PRINTED. Comment NPAP1: NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS PRINTED.

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RILEY MANFORD LACEY DEVEREUX. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY RILEY MANFORD, LACEY DEVEREUX.

Case Management Statement.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER. Comment CMS: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER.

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dispositioned; Party; Name; DEVEREUX, LACEY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; MANFORD, RILEY; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; CLIMER, CHRISTINA; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment CDCS: CASE DISPO`D - CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Statement.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CHRISTINA CLIMER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 11/27/12. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEAR Comment ACOA: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 11/27/12. ARBITRATOR: JAMES V. LEE. ARBITRATION HEARING DATE: 02/19/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment AFS: ARBITRATOR`S FEE STATEMENT MAILED TO ARBITRATOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment PAOA: AWARD OF ARBITRATOR FORM PRINTED TO SEND TO ARBITRATOR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment NOTAHA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR AND ARBITRATION HEARING DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment NAA: NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF ARBITRATOR MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Arbitrator.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED Comment NAA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CLIMER SERVED ON LACEY DEVEREUX WITH SERVIC Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CLIMER SERVED ON LACEY DEVEREUX WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/22/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLIMER, CHRISTINA; Case Payment Receipt # 201206190674 CLIMER, CHRISTINA $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • FinancialFinancial info for CLIMER, CHRISTINA; Transaction Assessment $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • FinancialFinancial; CLIMER, CHRISTINA; Total Financial Assessment $395.00; Total Payments and Credits $395.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/19/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120619-0674-CK 166/ 395.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-PI-001

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address): FOR COURT USE ONLY David Hart (#219517) Law Office of David L. Hart 1750 Francisco Blvd, Suite 15

Pacifica, CA 94044 TELEPHONE NO: 650-355-3000 FAX NO (Optional): 650-355-0250

E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional): david(@bayareacomplaw.com ATTORNEY FOR (Name): Plaintiff

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF San Mateo STREET ADDRESS: 400 County Center

MAILING ADDRESS

CITY AND ZIP CODE: Redwood City, California 94063 BRANCH NAME: Superior Court PLAINTIFF: Christina Climer

DEFENDANT: Riley Manford; Lacey Devereux

[X] poes 110 20 COMPLAINT-Personal Injury, Property Damage, Wrongful Death [ ] AMENDED (Number):

Type (check all that apply): [X] MOTOR VEHICLE [__] OTHER (specify): [X] Property Damage [ __| Wrongful Death [X] Personal injury [[] Other Damages (specify): Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER:

[_] ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded [ ] does not exceed $10,000 [ ] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 [2X] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000) 5 ' g g {__] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint uw 1 4 6 [ from limited to unlimited | from unlimited to limited

1. Plaintiff (name or names): Christina Climer alleges causes of action against defendant (name or names): ' Riley Manford; Lacey Devereux and Does 1-20 BY F AX 2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: § 3. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult a. [__] except plaintiff (name): (1) [_] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] a public entity (describe): (4) ] aminor [__] an adult ) [:] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [_] other (specify): (5) [ ] other (specify). b. [_] except plaintiff (name): (1) [__] a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) ] an unincorporated entity (describe)’ (3) [__] a public entity (descnbe): (4) [ ] aminor ] anadult (@) [__] for whom a guardian or conservator of the estate or a guardian ad litem has been appointed (b) [_] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HASSELL, DAWN L.