This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 16:46:08 (UTC).

Robert L. Codner vs. Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 Robert L Codner filed an Other lawsuit against Gilead Sciences, Inc. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4518

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Viano, Chester

Codner, Robert L.

Meiggs, Dan

Isom, Darryl

Bitner, Edgar

Robinson, Joseph

Vanpelt, Leonard

Bradley, Scott A.

Wheeler, Tonya

Defendant

Gilead Sciences, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM, M. ELIZABETH

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Case Management Order.

Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing RE: CMO #1 Comment RE: CMO #1

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketComplex Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 2:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketCase Management and Trial Setting Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.; Additional Info: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Mailing.; Additional Info: Affidavit of Mailing RE: CMO #1 Comment RE: CMO #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Order.; Additional Info: Case Management Order CMO #1 Comment CMO #1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Viano, Chester; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-039287-HOJ Viano, Chester $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Viano, Chester; Transaction Assessment $1435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Viano, Chester; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 10/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilead Sciences, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRAHAM, M. ELIZABETH