This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 00:26:18 (UTC).

CHARLES FORD VS MOHAMMED YUSUF

Case Summary

On 01/03/2013 CHARLES FORD filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MOHAMMED YUSUF. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Novak, Lisa A, Dylina, Steven L, Grandsaert, John L, LISA A. NOVAK and STEVEN L. DYLINA. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8843

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Novak, Lisa A

Dylina, Steven L

Grandsaert, John L

LISA A. NOVAK

STEVEN L. DYLINA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FORD, CHARLES

Defendant

YUSUF, MOHAMED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LARSEN, BRIAN L.

Defendant Attorney

SMITH, CARY S

 

Court Documents

Motion.

NOTICE (2) Comment NM: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ATTENDANCE AND TESTIMONY AT DEPOSITION FILED BY MOHAMED YUSUF

Document.

FILING (4) Comment FILED: CLERK'S NOTICE OF PRE-ARBITRATION AND SETTING HEARING FILED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Conversion Action.

NOTICE (7) Comment NRA: NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ARBITRATOR ARA R. JABAGCHOURIAN FILED BY MOHAMED YUSUF

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

Conversion Action.

ARBITRATION (4) Comment NPAP1: NOTICE OF PROPOSED ARBITRATORS PRINTED.

Conversion Action.

STIPULATION (2) Comment PCAH: PARTIES STIPULATE TO CONTINUE ARBITRATION HEARING FROM 02/11/15 TO 03/03/15.

Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator.

NOTICE (6) Comment NAA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED

Conversion Action.

ARBITRATION Comment NFAA: NOTICE OF FILING OF ARBITRATOR AWARD FILED.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Conversion Hearing.

5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

Notice.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY MOHAMED YUSUF. Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FILED BY MOHAMED YUSUF.

Conversion Action.

PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE Comment PNTWO: PRINT COMBINED MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL OR COURT TRIAL NOTICE

Conversion Action.

REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO AFTER ARBITRATION FILED BY CHARLES FORD. CASE RETURNED TO CIVIL ACTIVE LI Comment RTDN: REQUEST FOR TRIAL DE NOVO AFTER ARBITRATION FILED BY CHARLES FORD. CASE RETURNED TO CIVIL ACTIVE LIST

Conversion Action.

NOTICE OF FILING OF ARBITRATOR AWARD FILED. Comment NFAA: NOTICE OF FILING OF ARBITRATOR AWARD FILED.

Conversion Action.

PARTIES STIPULATE TO CONTINUE ARBITRATION HEARING FROM 02/11/15 TO 03/03/15. Comment PCAH: PARTIES STIPULATE TO CONTINUE ARBITRATION HEARING FROM 02/11/15 TO 03/03/15.

Conversion Action.

APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 12/12/14. ARBITRATOR: KEVIN G. KELLY. ARBITRATION HE Comment ACOA: APPOINTMENT AND CONSENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED ON 12/12/14. ARBITRATOR: KEVIN G. KELLY. ARBITRATION HEARING DATE: 02/11/15.

Notice of Assignment of Arbitrator.

NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED Comment NAA: NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF ARBITRATOR FILED

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2015
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 OSC RE: DISMISSAL AFTER SETTLEMENT AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • DispositionDisposition: Judgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name; YUSUF, MOHAMED; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name; FORD, CHARLES; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.; Additional Info: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED. Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: MATTER SETTLED AT THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ON 06-08-15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment PNJT: PRINT NOTICES FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS. Comment JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HV: HEARING VACATED. REASON: TRIAL SHOULD HAVE BEEN SET AS A JURY TRIAL - FEES WERE PAID ON 9-04-13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: Comment COURT TRIAL (LONG CAUSE). TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2015
  • DocketJury Trial.; Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: PJ JURY TRIAL. TIME ESTIMATE: 5 DAYS 00:00 HOURS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability of Counsel.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL BRIAN L. LARSEN FROM FROM APRIL 1 2013 TO JULY 1, 2013. Comment NUA: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL BRIAN L. LARSEN FROM FROM APRIL 1, 2013 TO JULY 1, 2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for FORD, CHARLES; Case Payment Receipt # 201301030305 FORD, CHARLES $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for FORD, CHARLES; Transaction Assessment $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; FORD, CHARLES; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/03/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130103-0305-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00. Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10,000.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

ary S. Smith STATE BAR NO. 127854

CARBONE, SMOKE, SMITH,

BENT & LEONARD ATTORNEYSATEO COUNW

1735 TECHNOLOGY DRIVE, SUITE 500 SAN JOSE, CA 95110

(408) 392-8663 ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT MOHAMMED YUSUF

SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF SAN MATEO

LIMITED CIVIL JURISDICTION

Charles Ford, Case No. CLJ518843 Plaintiff, ANSWER TO COMPLAINT V. Mohammed Yusuf and Does 1- 10, Defendants.

COMES NOW defendant Mohammed Yusuf and answers the complaint on file herein as follows:

1. Under the provisions of Section 431.30 of the Code of Civil Procedure of the State of California, this answering defendant generally denies each and every allegation of the complaint, and the whole thereof, and further denies that plaintiff has been or is now or will be damaged to the extent alleged or to any other extent.

AS AND FOR FURTHER, SEPARATE AND DISTINCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWERING DEFENDANT AVERS:

FIRST AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

2. The incident or incidents complained of by plaintiff herein were caused, in whole

or in part, by the negligence of the plaintiff. Any recovery by plaintiff in this case must be

reduced by that percentage of the plaintiff's negligence which contributed to the incident or

reduced by that percentage of the plaintiff's negligence which contributed to the incident or incidents.

incidents.

SECOND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

3. Plaintiff failed to use reasonable care to mitigate, in whole or in part, the damages alleged in the complaint.

THIRD AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

4. Damages complained of by plaintiff herein were caused, in whole or in part, by acts and omissions of persons other than this answering defendant, which other personsnamed as defendants in this action. This answering defendant should only be required to pay that portion of the plaintiff's damages attributable to this answering defendant pursuant to Civil Code sections 1431.2 and/or 1432.

FOURTH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE

5. The complaint and/or causes of action therein fail to state facts sufficient to constitute a cause of action against this answering defendant. WHEREFORE, defendant prays: 1. That plaintiff takes nothing; 2. For costs of suit herein; and 3. For such other and further relief as the Court deems just and proper. DATED: 8/39 /\3 CARBONE, SMOKE, SMITH, BENT & LEONARD

Cary S. Smiifi

Attorneys for Defendant Mohammed Yusuf

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larsen, Brian L.