This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/16/2022 at 05:27:19 (UTC).

CHAILE STEINBERG VS. SUNRUN INC

Case Summary

On 06/10/2016 CHAILE STEINBERG filed an Other lawsuit against SUNRUN INC. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L, Foiles, Robert D and Etezadi, Susan I. The case status is Other - Consolidated.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9064

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Foiles, Robert D

Etezadi, Susan I

 

Party Details

Defendants

SUNTRUST ROBINSON HUMPHREY, INC

SUNRUN INC

MERRILL LYNC, PIERCE, FENNER &SMITH INC

KEYBANC CAPITAL MARKETS INC

MORGAN STANLEY & CO. LLC

GOLDMAN, SACS & CO

CREDIT SUISSE SECURITIES (USA)LLC

FOUNDATION CAPITALMANAGEMENT CO. VI, LLC

14 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Complex Case Status Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Conversion Hearing.

COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE Comment COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

Complex Case Status Conference.

CIV Minutes Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Comment Dept: PJLM COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;ADR PACKAGE... Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET;ADR PACKAGE...

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing Complex Case Status Conference Comment Complex Case Status Conference

Complex Case Status Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Conversion Hearing.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference.

Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

Complex Case Status Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

Stipulation.

Stipulation EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT Comment EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Conversion Hearing.

COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE Comment COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

Complex Case Status Conference.

CIV Minutes Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Comment Dept: PJLM COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of.

Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt of SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Comment SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2017
  • DocketComplex Case Status Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: 21 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing.; Additional Info: Notice of Hearing Complex Case Status Conference Comment Complex Case Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Case Status Conference.; Additional Info: CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Hearing.; Additional Info: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Comment CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DocketCase Consolidation Granted.; Additional Info: Comment CIV538215

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Complex Case Status Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of Complex Case Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Case Status Conference.; Additional Info: CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for WONG, RICHARD; Case Payment Receipt # 2016-033781-HOJ PEELLE, BEAU $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • FinancialFinancial info for WONG, RICHARD; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2016
  • FinancialFinancial; STEINBERG, CHAILE; Total Financial Assessment $1,435.00; Total Payments and Credits $1,435.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/10/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160610-0522-CK 034/ 1000.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketComplex litigation fee received from plaintiff.; Additional Info: Comment CLFEEP: COMPLEX LITIGATION FEE OF $1000.00 RECEIVED FROM CHAILE STEINBERG (PLAINTIFF).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: CERTIFICATE OF RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FILED BY CHAILE STEINBERG Comment CER: CERTIFICATE OF RE: COMPLEX CASE DESIGNATION FILED BY CHAILE STEINBERG

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 160610-0493-CK 194/ 435.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOUNDATION CAPITALMANAGEMENT CO. VI, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYBANC CAPITAL MARKETS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SUNRUN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO., INC. is a litigant