This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 04/30/2022 at 16:01:11 (UTC).

Cesar Ramirez vs. Max William Wentlandt, M.D., et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 Cesar Ramirez filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Max William Wentlandt, M D . This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Chou, Danny Y and CHOU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0163

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Chou, Danny Y

Not Yet Classified

CHOU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ramirez, Cesar

Defendants

Wentlandt, M.D., Max William

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

The Permanente Medical Group, Inc.

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

DOES 1 THROUGH 100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIGELMAN, KENNETH M.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Order.

Order Type: EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCESigned by: JUDGE Comment Type: EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 3/21/2022 MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY ON 3/22/2022

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of CMC Zoom

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Case Management Conferences - Hearing Time 9:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference.; Additional Info: Notice of CMC Zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Cesar; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-010645-HOJ Ramirez, Cesar $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Cesar; Transaction Assessment $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder.; Additional Info: Order Type: EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCESigned by: JUDGE Comment Type: EXTENDING TIME TO SERVE AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Signed by: JUDGE CHOU Date Signed: 3/21/2022 MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY ON 3/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Cesar; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-002215-HOJ Ramirez, Cesar $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Ramirez, Cesar; Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Ramirez, Cesar; Total Financial Assessment $455.00; Total Payments and Credits $455.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIGELMAN KENNETH