This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 03:15:34 (UTC).

CESAR FLORES vs. DPR CONSTRUCTION, et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2016 CESAR FLORES filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DPR CONSTRUCTION. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D and Etezadi, Susan I.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0041

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Etezadi, Susan I.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORES, CESAR

Defendants

DPR CONSTRUCTION III, INC.

DPR GP PAYROLL

DOES 1 TO 100

DPR CONSTRUCTION II, INC

DPR CONSTRUCTION

DPR CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIMODA, GALEN T

Defendant Attorney

MURRAY, MARGARET E

 

Court Documents

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case.

Notice of Settlement of Entire Case UNCONDITIONAL Comment UNCONDITIONAL

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial.

Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited)

Proof of Service.

Proof of Service BY CERTIFIED MAIL OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT OF DPR CONSTRUCTION SIGNED BY MARGAREY MURR Comment BY CERTIFIED MAIL OF SUMMONS/COMPLAINT OF DPR CONSTRUCTION, SIGNED BY MARGAREY MURRAY BUT NOT DATED

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Stipulation and Order to ADR.

Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held - Parties Present DefendantAttorney: MURRAY, MARGARET E

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Notice.

Notice OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES. Comment OF DEPOSITING JURY FEES.

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties).

Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) WITHOUT PREJUDICE Comment WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Notice of Case Management Conference.

Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (PER REQUEST OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 12/20/16).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (UNCONDITIONAL).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names: DPR CONSTRUCTION INC.; DPR CONSTRUCTION II, INC; DPR CONSTRUCTION III, INC.; DPR GP PAYROLL; Comment: PARTIES DISMISSED PER REQUESTS FOR DISMISSALS FILED 9-7-16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • Jury Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment JURY TRIAL. ESTIMATE: 10 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mandatory Settlement Conferences - Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal ENTIRE ACTION With Prejudice Comment ENTIRE ACTION, With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case UNCONDITIONAL Comment UNCONDITIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • ADR Mediation Scheduled.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2016
  • ADR Evaluation Notice Sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order to ADR. Additional Info: Stipulation and Order to ADR Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Financial info for DPR CONSTRUCTION : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-036870-HOJ ONE LEGAL LLC $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Financial info for DPR CONSTRUCTION : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • Financial: DPR CONSTRUCTION; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for FLORES, CESAR : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-047879-HOJ FLORES, CESAR $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Financial info for FLORES, CESAR : Transaction Assessment $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2016
  • Financial info for FLORES, CESAR : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-021415-HOJ FLORES, CESAR $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2016
  • Financial info for FLORES, CESAR : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2016
  • Financial: FLORES, CESAR; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

    Read MoreRead Less