This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 01:00:54 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I LLC VS XAVIER D RIVERA ETAL

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 CAVALRY SPV I LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against XAVIER D RIVERA ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****5841

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

RIVERA, XAVIER

OF HSBC BANK NEVADA NA

Defendants

XAVIER D RIVERA

RIVERA, XAVIER

RIVERA, XAVIER D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN, BRIAN N

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE VENUE

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS TO XAVIER D RIVERA BY SUB-SERVING MELISSA YUEN, OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 08/14/12.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: RIVERA XAVIER D; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS TO XAVIER D RIVERA BY SUB-SERVING MELISSA YUEN, OCCUPANT. MAILING DATE OF 08/14/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/06/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION RE VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120808-0154-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Financial info for CAVALRY SPV I LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201208080154 CAVALRY SPV I LLC $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Financial info for CAVALRY SPV I LLC : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2012
  • Financial: CAVALRY SPV I LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less