This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2022 at 01:17:48 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs. EMELITA CABRERA, et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2022 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EMELITA CABRERA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Halperin, Ernst A and Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2695

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Halperin, Ernst A

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I, LLC

CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendants

CABRERA, EMELITA

South San Francisco, CA 94080-5504

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZARCO, GLORIA

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

NelsonKennard_21-37262_com_eABC.pdf

Summons Issued / Filed.

NelsonKennard_21-37262_sum_eABC.pdf

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

NelsonKennard_21-37262_ccs_eABC.pdf

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Halperin Ernst A. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.; Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020) Comment AND NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-025165-HOJ Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a. $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; CAVALRY SPV I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 07/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zarco, Gloria