This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 02/18/2023 at 16:47:09 (UTC).

Cavalry Spv I, LLC vs. Carlos Veliz, et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 Cavalry Spv I, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Carlos Veliz,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5353

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cavalry Spv I, LLC

AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK, N.A.

Defendants

Veliz, Carlos

San Mateo, CA 94402-1702

DOES 1 TO 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON, JOHN E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

Declaration of Non-Service.

Declaration of Non-Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service.; Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service.; Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Service.; Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cavalry Spv I, LLC; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2022-045700-HOJ Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Citibank, N.a. $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial info for Cavalry Spv I, LLC; Transaction Assessment $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • FinancialFinancial; Cavalry Spv I, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less