This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/23/2023 at 15:21:06 (UTC).

Rui Ding vs. Yiqin Wang, et al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2023 Rui Ding filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Yiqin Wang,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Swope, V. Raymond and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1880

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Swope, V. Raymond

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ding, Rui

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Wang, Yiqin

Zhao, Yincheng

FX10, LLC

Berryessa Water Sports

Plan B Equipment Rentals

DOES 1 TO 100

FX10 INT'L, INC.

ROES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FX10, LLC

FX10 INT'L, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLOYD, JEREMY D.

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

GELINI, JENNIFER A. KUNG

FELDER, B OTIS

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FELDER, B OTIS

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Amended Summons Issued / Filed.

Amended Summons Issued / Filed

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF DEPOSI Comment SUMMONS, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES, NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, ADR INFORMATION PACKET, SERVED TO CHAD FRAIZER, AGENT FOR SERVICE

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS/COMPLAINT QUESTIONABLE: NO DECLARATION RE: DILIGE Comment SUMMONS/COMPLAINT QUESTIONABLE: NO DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of QUESTIONABLE: NO DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE Comment QUESTIONABLE: NO DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OFTIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO F Comment IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT TO FILE DEMURRER UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2) AND TO FILE MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 435.5(a)(2)

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered.

Request for Entry of Default Not Entered AS TO DEFENDANTS PER 30DAY EXTENSION FILED ON 6/16/2023. Comment AS TO DEFENDANTS PER 30DAY EXTENSION FILED ON 6/16/2023.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of AMENDED SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; ADR INFO Comment AMENDED SUMMONS; CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; COMPLAINT; ADR INFORMATION PACKET; NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES; ETC

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer to COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Comment Answer to COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer (Unlimited).

Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

Cross Complaint.

Cross Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/23/2023

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Plan B Equipment Rentals; Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

FinancialFinancial; Plan B Equipment Rentals; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $0.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

FinancialFinancial info for FX10 INT'L, INC.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

FinancialFinancial info for FX10 INT'L, INC.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-025155-HOJ FX10, LLC $870.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2023

FinancialFinancial; FX10 INT'L, INC.; Total Financial Assessment $435.00; Total Payments and Credits $870.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCross Complaint.; Additional Info: Cross Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer (Unlimited).; Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer TO COMPLAINT Comment Answer TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Zhao, Yincheng; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-024744-HOJ Zhao, Yincheng $585.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Zhao, Yincheng; Transaction Assessment $585.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees.; Additional Info: Notice of Posting Jury Fees

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Ding, Rui; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-013889-HOJ Ding, Rui $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Ding, Rui; Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023

FinancialFinancial; Ding, Rui; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 04/24/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/24/2023

DocketNew Filed Case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less