This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 11/09/2023 at 15:17:52 (UTC).

Carson Levit, Trustee Of The Levit Family Revocable Trust, et al vs. Real Advantage Title Insurance Company, a California corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2023 Carson Levit, Trustee Of The Levit Family Revocable Trust, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Real Advantage Title Insurance Company, a California corporation,. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Weiner, Marie S and Mau, Michael L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3789

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Weiner, Marie S

Mau, Michael L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carson Levit, Trustee Of The Levit Family Revocable Trust

Bronstein, Donald M.

Donald M Bronstein Trustee Of The Don And Cheryl Bronstein Family Trust Acct 125

Donald M. Bronstein, Trustee Of The Kimberly Bronstein Living Trust

Donald M. Bronstein, Trustee Of The Nicole Bronstein Living Trust

Ira Services Trust Company, Custodian Fbo Donald M. Bronstein Ira

Custodian FBO Donald M Bronstein IRA

Defendants

Real Advantage Title Insurance Company, a California corporation

DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOLDSTEIN, JASON E

Defendant Attorney

WAGONER, JAMES P

 

Court Documents

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes.

Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/31/2023 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/31/2023 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Continued Court's Motion

Case Management Conference.

Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/31/2023 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/31/2023 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Continued Court's Motion

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION T Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS Comment OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Motion.

Motion TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Comment TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice.

Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLA Comment IN SUPPORT OF REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Hearing re.

Notice of Hearing re REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Comment REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Comment OF DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Demurrer to.

Demurrer to COMPLAINT Comment COMPLAINT

Declaration in Support.

Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF JAMES P. WAGONER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE Comment DECLARATION OF JAMES P. WAGONER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT RE: GOOD FAITH MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS

Notice of Posting Jury Fees.

Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Declaration.

Declaration OF JAMES P. WAGONER RE: GOOD FAITH MEET AND CONFER AS TO DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE Comment OF JAMES P. WAGONER RE: GOOD FAITH MEET AND CONFER AS TO DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Declaration.

Declaration OF JAMES P. WAGONER RE: GOOD FAITH MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TI Comment OF JAMES P. WAGONER RE: GOOD FAITH MEET AND CONFER REGARDING DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS DEMURRERS TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT C.C.P 430.41(a)(1)-(2)

Affidavit of Mailing.

Affidavit of Mailing Order Deeming Cases Related and Order Reassigning All Purpose Judge Comment Order Deeming Cases Related and Order Reassigning All Purpose Judge

Order.

Order Deeming Cases Related and Order Reassigning All Purpose Judge Comment Deeming Cases Related and Order Reassigning All Purpose Judge

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/23/2024

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2023

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Mau Michael L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketMotion to Strike.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketHearing on Demurrer.; Additional Info: Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Comment TO COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Reassignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Reassignment for All Purposes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCase Management Conference.; Additional Info: Original Type Case Management Conference ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/31/2023 ~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 10/31/2023 Judicial Officer Weiner Marie S. Hearing Time 2:00 PM Result Continued Court's Motion

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Real Advantage Title Insurance Company, a California corporation; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-035558-HOJ Real Advantage Title Insurance Company, a California corporation $180.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/17/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Real Advantage Title Insurance Company, a California corporation; Transaction Assessment $180.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Judicial Notice.; Additional Info: Request for Judicial Notice IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION T Comment IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT REAL ADVANTAGE TITLE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProposed Order Received.; Additional Info: Proposed Order Received [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT Comment [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
08/14/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Bronstein, Donald M.; eFile Online Payment Receipt # 2023-028022-HOJ Bronstein, Donald M. $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

FinancialFinancial info for Bronstein, Donald M.; Transaction Assessment $435.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

FinancialFinancial; Bronstein, Donald M.; Total Financial Assessment $585.00; Total Payments and Credits $585.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Assignment for All Purposes.; Additional Info: Notice of Assignment for All Purposes and CMC (New Case Starting Dec 1 2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 08/11/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Related Case.; Additional Info: Notice of Related Case 30-2021-01237360-CU-IC-NJC Comment 30-2021-01237360-CU-IC-NJC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/11/2023

DocketNew Filed Case.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less