This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 21:16:37 (UTC).

CARLOS J Q OLIVIER VS GONZALO QUINTANA ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/15/2016 CARLOS J Q OLIVIER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GONZALO QUINTANA ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Foiles, Robert D, Scott, Joseph C, Grandsaert, John L, DuBois, Richard H, Scott, Joseph C., DuBois, Richard H., Etezadi, Susan I. and Grandsaert, John L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6978

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Foiles, Robert D

Scott, Joseph C

Grandsaert, John L

DuBois, Richard H

Scott, Joseph C.

DuBois, Richard H.

Etezadi, Susan I.

Grandsaert, John L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CARLOS J QUEVEDO OLIVIER

Redwood City, CA 94063

OLIVIER, CARLOS J QUEVEDO

OLIVIER, CARLOS QUEVEDO

Defendants

GONZALO QUINTANA

CAROLINA MUNOZ SOLE PROP

GM MANAGEMENT SERVICES

QUINTANA, GONZALO

MUNOZ, CAROLINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SULLIVAN, ROBERT W

Defendant Attorney

GONZALEZ, JOSE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by MAIL of.

Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS QUEVEDO OLIVIER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.... Comment ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS QUEVEDO OLIVIER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT....

Proof of Service by FAX of.

Proof of Service by FAX of EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY STIPULATION OF THE PAR Comment EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES; MEMO P&A ETC

Declaration.

Declaration IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY STIPULATION OF THE PART Comment IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

Amended Complaint.

Amended Complaint 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT Comment 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Case Management Conference.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: OLIVIER, CARLOS J QUEVEDODefendant: QUINTANA, GONZALO

Notice of Hearing.

Notice of Hearing OSC RE: DISMISSAL FAILURE TO PROSECUTE Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL FAILURE TO PROSECUTE

Case Management Statement.

Case Management Statement

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF OLIVIER AS TO GONZALO QUINTANA BY SUB-S Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF OLIVIER AS TO GONZALO QUINTANA, BY SUB-SERVING VICTOR INFANTE. MAILING DATE OF 02/05/16.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of.

Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIA Comment DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE BY STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES

Opposition.

Opposition TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES Comment TO DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Proposed Order Received.

Proposed Order Received ON DEMURRER. Comment ON DEMURRER.

Demurrer to.

Demurrer to PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES ETC. Comment PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, ETC.

Ex Parte Application.

Ex Parte Application TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SITPULATION OF THE PARTIES Comment TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY SITPULATION OF THE PARTIES

Order.

Order Signed by Judge Etezadi TONTINUING TRIAL DATE (COPY FORWARDED TO MASTER CALENDAR) Comment Signed by Judge Etezadi TONTINUING TRIAL DATE (COPY FORWARDED TO MASTER CALENDAR)

Notice of Court Trial.

Notice of Court Trial on 02/27/17 at 9:00 am. Comment on 02/27/17 at 9:00 am.

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismiss Fail to Prosecute Timely.

CIV Minute Order Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held Parties Present Plaintiff: OLIVIER, CARLOS J QUEVEDODefendant: QUINTANA, GONZALO

Fee Waiver Granted.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY CARLOS J QUEVEDO OLIVIER GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $ Comment OWFG: ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF FEES FILED BY CARLOS J QUEVEDO OLIVIER GRANTEDIN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00 SIGNED BY JS ON 01/22/16.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - With Prejudice; Party; Names: OLIVIER CARLOS QUEVEDO; QUINTANA, GONZALO; MUNOZ, CAROLINA; Comment: ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Settlement; Comment; Comment; (CONDITIONAL).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Grandsaert John L. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Comment With Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Court Trial. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Etezadi Susan I. Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment Time estimate= 1 day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Mandatory Settlement Conference. Additional Info: Judicial Officer Foiles Robert D Hearing Time 1:30 PM Cancel Reason Case Settled Comment PER ORDER FILED ON 6.30.17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement of Entire Case. Additional Info: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case CONDITIONAL Comment CONDITIONAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by MAIL of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS QUEVEDO OLIVIER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT.... Comment ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CARLOS QUEVEDO OLIVIER'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT....

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (Unlimited). Additional Info: Answer (Unlimited) Answer Comment Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial. Additional Info: Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
72 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2016
  • Financial info for QUINTANA, GONZALO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-030355-HOJ QUINTANA, GONZALO $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Financial info for QUINTANA, GONZALO : Transaction Assessment $1.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Financial info for QUINTANA, GONZALO : Case Payment Receipt # 201602230041 QUINTANA, GONZALO $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Financial info for QUINTANA, GONZALO : Transaction Assessment $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Financial: QUINTANA, GONZALO; Total Financial Assessment $593.50; Total Payments and Credits $593.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial info for OLIVIER, CARLOS QUEVEDO : Case Payment Receipt # 2017-019600-HOJ NADEEM MAKADA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • Financial info for OLIVIER, CARLOS QUEVEDO : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Financial info for OLIVIER, CARLOS QUEVEDO : Case Payment Receipt # 2016-065297-HOJ NADEEM H MAKADA $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Financial info for OLIVIER, CARLOS QUEVEDO : Transaction Assessment $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Financial: OLIVIER, CARLOS QUEVEDO; Total Financial Assessment $120.00; Total Payments and Credits $120.00

    Read MoreRead Less