This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:20:49 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE VS ANNETTE J FRANKLIN

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CAPITAL ONE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ANNETTE J FRANKLIN. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4880

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)

Defendants

ANNETTE J FRANKLIN

FRANKLIN, ANNETTE J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUNDQUIST, ANDREW P

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) SERVED ON ANNETTE J FRANKLIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/14/12.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2012
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: FRANKLIN ANNETTE J; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA); Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) SERVED ON ANNETTE J FRANKLIN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 07/14/12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120629-0241-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) : Case Payment Receipt # 201206290241 CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • Financial: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA); Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less