This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:44:04 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. SIONE M KAHO, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SIONE M KAHO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Foiles, Robert D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2802

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Foiles, Robert D

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendants

KAHO, SIONE M

DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON, JESSICA N.

 

Court Documents

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGESES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 3/9/19 Amount: 4 Comment County: LOS ANGESES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 3/9/19 Amount: 4360.56

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 5 INCLUSIVE, ONLY Comment Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE, ONLY

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON JOHN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON JOHN DOE, OCCUPANT

Notice of Change of Firm Name.

Notice of Change of Firm Name

Complaint.

Complaint

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $131.00 Credit: $0 Interest: $0

Declaration of Non-Military Status.

Declaration of Non-Military Status

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Default Judgment by Court.

Default Judgment by Court

Declaration.

Declaration OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS Comment OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Foiles Robert D; Judgment Type; Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: KAHO, SIONE M; Amount; Damages: $3,909.56; Attorney Fees: $0.00; Costs: $295.00; Total: $4204.56; Party; Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; KAHO, SIONE M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: DOES 1 THROUGH 5 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution Return. Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGESES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 3/9/19 Amount: 4 Comment County: LOS ANGESES Status: Partially Satisfied Issued on: 3/9/19 Amount: 4360.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name. Additional Info: Notice of Change of Firm Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment to the County of LOS ANGELES Issued On: 03/09/19 Amount: $4360.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit and declaration of accrued interestCos Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: $131.00 Credit: $0 Interest: $0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment Amount: $4204.56

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Judgment by Court. Additional Info: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Military Status. Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Military Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033. Additional Info: Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-014411-HOJ CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2019
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-074642-HOJ CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037390-HOJ LEGAL EXPRESS LIMITED $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $275.00; Total Payments and Credits $275.00

    Read MoreRead Less