Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:41:50 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. NIDIA M ALVARADO, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NIDIA M ALVARADO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DuBois, Richard H.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2799

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

DuBois, Richard H.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE

ALVARADO, NIDIA M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON, JESSICA N.

 

Court Documents

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 5. INCLUSIVE ONLY Comment Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 5. INCLUSIVE ONLY

Complaint.

Complaint

Default Judgment by Court.

Default Judgment by Court

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, ETC SERVED ON: MICK ALVARADO, OCCUPAN Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ETC SERVED ON: MICK ALVARADO, OCCUPANT

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment.

Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

Declaration.

Declaration OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS Comment OF PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS

Declaration of Non-Military Status.

Declaration of Non-Military Status

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Name: DOES 1 THROUGH 5 INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; DuBois Richard H.; Judgment Type; Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: ALVARADO, NIDIA M; Amount; Damages: $3,546.44; Costs: $295.00; Total: $3841.44; Party; Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; ALVARADO, NIDIA M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Writ of Execution Issued. Additional Info: Comment to the County of SACRAMENTO Issued On: 08/07/19 Amount: 3997.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit. Additional Info: Comment and declaration of accrued interest Costs: 131.00 Credit: 0 Interest: 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment Amount:$3841.44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Judgment by Court. Additional Info: Default Judgment by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Military Status. Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Military Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033. Additional Info: Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment. Additional Info: Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Judgment pursuant to CCP 585 Comment pursuant to CCP 585

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 5. INCLUSIVE ONLY Comment Without Prejudice DOES 1 THROUGH 5. INCLUSIVE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2019-048722-HOJ ATKINSON, JESSICA N. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-080198-HOJ ATKINSON, JESSICA N. $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037549-HOJ LEGAL EXPRESS LIMITED $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $275.00; Total Payments and Credits $275.00

    Read MoreRead Less