This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:43:55 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. MARIA LOMBERA, et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA LOMBERA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2800

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE

LOMBERA, MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATKINSON, JESSICA N.

 

Court Documents

Complaint.

Complaint

Declaration.

Declaration OF PLAINITIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS Comment OF PLAINITIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON MS. Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON MS. LOMBERA, SISTER/OCCUPANT

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Party; Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A.; LOMBERA, MARIA; DOES 1 THROUGH 5, INCLUSIVE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION Comment Without Prejudice OF ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON MS. Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON MS. LOMBERA, SISTER/OCCUPANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Declaration OF PLAINITIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS Comment OF PLAINITIFF'S ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037550-HOJ LEGAL EXPRESS LIMITED $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less