This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 07:43:09 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs. ALISON U LEE

Case Summary

On 06/04/2018 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALISON U LEE. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cretan, Clifford V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2805

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cretan, Clifford V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

Defendant

LEE, ALISON U

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WONG, JENNIFER

 

Court Documents

Statement.

Statement OF CASE Comment OF CASE

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033.

Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

Summons Issued / Filed.

Summons Issued / Filed

Request to Enter Default.

Request to Enter Default

Judgment.

Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT Comment DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

Complaint.

Complaint

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

Declaration of Non-Military Status.

Declaration of Non-Military Status DECLARATION RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS Comment DECLARATION RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2019
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judicial Officer; Cretan Clifford V.; Judgment Type; Default Judgment by Court; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Awarded Against: LEE, ALISON U; Amount; Damages: $4,595.46; Costs: $290.00; Total: $4885.46; Party; Names: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; LEE, ALISON U.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment. Additional Info: Judgment DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT Comment DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033. Additional Info: Declaration pursuant to CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Military Status. Additional Info: Declaration of Non-Military Status DECLARATION RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS Comment DECLARATION RE NON-ACTIVE MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement. Additional Info: Statement OF CASE Comment OF CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Enter Default. Additional Info: Request to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of. Additional Info: Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Comment SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Summons Issued / Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Case Payment Receipt # 2018-037397-HOJ WONG, JENNIFER $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Financial: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less