This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 17:21:56 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA V BRIAN B SU

Case Summary

On 01/09/2013 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN B SU. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8826

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA

Defendants

BRIAN B SU

SU, BRIAN B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT, MICHAEL S.

151 Bernal Rd., Ste. 8

San Jose, CA 95119

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 01/30/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment D1033: DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 1033(B) FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA AS TO BRIAN B SU.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA AS TO BRIAN B SU, BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 01/21/13.

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2014
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Judgment; Judgment - Monetary Award; Awarded To: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA; Awarded Against: SU, BRIAN B; Comment: JUDGMENT ENTERED 01/30/14 JUDGMENT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA FOR CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BRIAN B SU PRINCIPAL IS $3,420.50. ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00. INTEREST IS $0.00. COSTS ARE $284.00. TOTAL JUDGMENT $3,704.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment. Additional Info: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Comment Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140218-0386-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment issued. Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment TOT1: TOTAL JUDGMENT $3704.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment COSTS: COSTS ARE $284.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment INT: INTEREST IS $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment AF: ATTORNEY FEES ARE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment PRI: PRINCIPAL IS $3420.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2014
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment JAGDF: DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST BRIAN B SU

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PSS: PROOF OF SERVICE (SUB-SERVICE) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA AS TO BRIAN B SU, BY SUB-SERVING JOHN DOE, CO-RESIDENT. MAILING DATE OF 01/21/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/09/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130109-0100-CK 170/ 225.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM5: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT $10000.00 OR LESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA : Case Payment Receipt # 201301090100 CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Financial info for CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA : Transaction Assessment $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2013
  • Financial: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), NA; Total Financial Assessment $225.00; Total Payments and Credits $225.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

PLD-C-001

SHORT TITLE: CASE NUMBER: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. V.

BRIAN B SU

4. (Continued) b. The true names and capacities of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1)[ 1 Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2)[ 1 Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c.[ ]Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Complaint - Attachment 4c. d.[ ] Defendants who are joined pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. [ ]Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a.[ ] plaintiff has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [

] plaintiff is excused from complying because (specify):

6. [ ] This action is subject to [ ] Civil Code section 1812.10 [ ] Civil Code section 2984 .4.

7. This court is the proper court because

a. [ ]adefendant entered into the contract here.

b.[ ]a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into.

c. [ X ] a defendant lives here now. [ ]the contract was to be performed here. [ ]a defendantis a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. [ ]real property that is the subject of this action is located here. [

d. e. f. g.[ ]other (specify):

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): [ ]Breach of Contract [ X] Common Counts [ ] Other (specify).

9.[ ]Other:

10. PLAINTIFF PRAYS for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for a.[X]damagesof $ _3420.50 b.[ ]interest on the damages (1)[ ]according to proof (2)[ ] at the rate of percent per year from (date): c.[ ]attorney fees (1)[ Jof$ (2)[ ] according to proof. d.[ ]other (specify):

11.[ ] The following paragraphs of this pleading are alleged on information and belief (specify paragraph numbers):

Date: October 29, 2012 MICHAEL S. HUNT #99804 OR

JANALIE HENRIQUES #111589

Anita H. Singh #270985

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) _ o ' (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTOR (If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)