This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/03/2022 at 05:57:42 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU VS ILA BANSIL ETAL

Case Summary

On 01/02/2013 CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ILA BANSIL ETAL. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Grandsaert, John L., Grandsaert, John L and JOHN L. GRANDSAERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8805

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

Judge Details

Judges

Grandsaert, John L

Grandsaert, John L.

JOHN L. GRANDSAERT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Defendants

BASIL, JESUS

BANSIL, ILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

3105 Fite Circle Suite 108

Sacramento, CA 95827

 

Court Documents

Notice.

NOTICE Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (3) Comment PSN1: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON JESUS BANSIL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/10/14 FILED.

Request to enter default filed.

REQUEST Comment REQDE: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC AS TO ILA BANSIL JESUS BASIL.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMO OF COSTS Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $62.97, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

APPLICATION (7) Comment APJD: (S) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JESUS BASIL FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST (2) Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC SERVED ON ILA BANSIL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/17/13.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

APPLICATION (6) Comment APJD: (S) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ILA BANSIL FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC FI Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC FILED

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of.

PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON JESUS BANSIL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/10/14 FILED. Comment PSN1: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SEE LIST SERVED ON JESUS BANSIL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/10/14 FILED.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

(S) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JESUS BASIL FILED BY CA Comment APJD: (S) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR JESUS BASIL FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination.

(S) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ILA BANSIL FILED BY CAL Comment APJD: (S) APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR ILA BANSIL FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Notice.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. Comment N2: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $62.97, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Notice.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC.

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 01/14/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 01/14/14 AS FOLLOWS:

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment JST: JUDGMENT ENTERED 01/14/14 -- SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment.; Additional Info: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC FI Comment ASJ2: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AS TO COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN MATEO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment MICMS: ENTERED BY A ORTEGA ON 01/15/15.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment HOC: HEARING OFF CALENDAR. REASON: NO PROOF OF SERVICE TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR PROVIDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: SERVICE PROVIDED IS BLANK THEREFORE, THE COURT CANNOT ISSUE A CIVIL BENCH WARRANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment FFT: PROOF OF SERVICE SUBMITTED TO THE COURT BY COUNSEL. THE COURT NOTES THAT THE PROOF OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment PTYNP: JESUS BASIL NOT PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment CPR: ABOVE-NOTED COUNSEL PRESENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment ACR: AT 09:58 COURT RECONVENES.

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Complaint/Petition.; Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC SERVED ON ILA Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC SERVED ON ILA BANSIL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/17/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Case Payment Receipt # 201301020464 CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Total Financial Assessment $371.00; Total Payments and Credits $371.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130102-0464-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

SHORTTITLE: CSB v. Bansil CASE NUMBER:

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [__] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [__]Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [__] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5.__] Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [__] is excused from complying because (specify):

6.[__] This action is subjectto [ | Civil Code section 1812.10 [__] Civil Code section 2984 .4. 7. This court is the proper court because a. [___] a defendant entered into the contract here. b. [__] a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into. . a defendant lives here now. . L_] the contract was to be performed here. . ] adefendantis a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. [ ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

] other (specify):

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): [ ] Breach of Contract [x] Common Counts

[ 1 Other (specify):

@ "o ao

9. [__] Other allegations:

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. [x | damagesof:$ 6,483.00

b. interest on the damages (1) [__] according to proof (2) [x] atthe rate of (specify): 10% percent per year from (date): See Cause of Action

C. attorney's fees (1) [x) of: $ BoO. L (2) [__] according to proof.

d. other (specify): All appropriate relief including costs of filing and serving complaint, Prejudgement Interest, and Attorney Fees. All documents attatched hereto are incorporated by reference as though fully set forth herein.

11.[x ] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): All paragraphs except paragraph 5 and paragraph 7C, If checked above.

Date: 12-08-2012 Michael K. Sipes, SBN 155148

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) {SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K