This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 16:29:57 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU VS FELICITAS DOMINGO

Case Summary

On 01/02/2013 CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FELICITAS DOMINGO. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8806

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Defendants

FELICITAS DOMINGO

DOMINGO, FELICITAS

CATINDIG, FELICITAS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

3050 Fite Circle, Suite 107

Sacramento, CA 95827

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

Notice of Conditional Statement.

NOTICE Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC SERVED ON FELICITAS DOMINGO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/17/13.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR REDUCTIN OF FILING FEES

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: DOMINGO FELICITAS; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Conversion Hearing. Additional Info: Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2014
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal. Additional Info: Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment Dept: TBA OSC RE: DISMISSAL HEARING AS TO DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION AFTER NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: NOTICE OF HEARING: OSC FOR DISMISSAL AFTER COURT'S RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130318-0825-CK 131/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • First Paper Fee Paid. Additional Info: Comment FFP: FIRST PAPER FEE PAID BY FELICITAS DOMINGO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Conditional Statement. Additional Info: NOTICE Comment NCS: NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition. Additional Info: PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC SERVED ON FELICITAS DOMINGO WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/17/13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130102-0460-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Financial info for DOMINGO, FELICITAS : Case Payment Receipt # 201303180825 DOMINGO, FELICITAS $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Financial info for DOMINGO, FELICITAS : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2013
  • Financial: DOMINGO, FELICITAS; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Financial info for CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC : Case Payment Receipt # 201301020460 CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Financial info for CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • Financial: CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

ATTORNEY OR PARTY WITHOUT ATTORNEY (Name, State Bar number, and address) FOR COURT USE ONLY Michael K. Sipes Michael K. Sipes 3050 Fite Cir #107

Sacramento, Ca 95827 TELEPHONENO: 866-656-7080 FAX NO. (Optional):

E-MAIL ADDRESS (Optional) ) ‘f’f D . ATTORNEY FOR (Name): Plaintiff ML Fq&o NTY SUPERIOR COURT OF CALIFORNIA, COUNTY OF San Mateo @l - SAN M sTReeTADDRESS: 400 County Center ) . MAILING ADDRESS: Same as Agove Jm\l -9 2913 ciryanp zip cooe: Redwood City, Ca 94063 oot BRANCHNAME: Civil PLAINTIFF. California Service Bureau, Inc.

;J,‘"!.‘.p

DEFENDANT: Felicitas Domingo AKA Felicitas Catindig

DOES1TO 10 CONTRACT

COMPLAINT || AMENDED COMPLAINT (Number):

[ ] CROSS-COMPLAINT [___] AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (Number): Jurisdiction (check all that apply): CASE NUMBER:

ACTION IS A LIMITED CIVIL CASE

Amount demanded does not exceed $10,000 ‘:I '[__] exceeds $10,000, but does not exceed $25,000 v

(] ACTION IS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE (exceeds $25,000)

[___] ACTION IS RECLASSIFIED by this amended complaint or cross-complaint [ ] from limited to unlimited [ ] from unlimited to limited

‘ 1. Plaintiff* (name or names): California Service Bureau, Inc. alleges causes of action against defendant* (name or names): Felicitas Domingo AKA Felicitas Catindig

2. This pleading, including attachments and exhibits, consists of the following number of pages: 3. a. Each plaintiff named above is a competent adult [x | except plaintiff (name): California Service Bureau, Inc.

(1) a corporation qualified to do business in California (2) [___] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) L_] other (specify):

b. [__] Plaintiff (name): a. [ ] has complied with the fictitious business name laws and is doing business under the fictitious name (specify):

b. [__] has complied with all licensing requirements as a licensed (specify):

c. [__! Information about additional plaintiffs who are not competent adults is shown in Attachment 3c. 4. a. Each defendant named above is a natural person

except defendant (name): [ except defendant (name):

(1) [__] a business organization, form unknown (1) [_] a business organization, form unknown r (2) [__] a corporation (2) (__] a corporation

(3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe): (3) [__] an unincorporated entity (describe):

(4) [__] a public entity (describe): (4) [__] a public entity (describe):

(5) [__] other (specify): (5) [__] other (specify):

* If this form 1s used as a cross-complaint, plaintff means cross-complainant and defendant means cross-defendant. Page 1 of 2

;; jl?c:?;lglpg::;‘e‘glfg;gapl:;grzguse COMPLA|NT_Contract SO{-]:E?J%S' Code of Civil Procedure, § 425.12 ? PLD-C-001 [Rev January 1, 2007] 7y fiu 3

;; jl?c:?;lglpg::;‘e‘glfg;gapl:;grzguse COMPLA|NT_Contract SO{-]:E?J%S' Code of Civil Procedure, § 425.12 ? PLD-C-001 [Rev January 1, 2007] 7y fiu 3 SHORTTITLE. CSB V. Domingo CASE NUMBER:

SHORTTITLE. CSB V. Domingo CASE NUMBER:

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [__] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [__] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

c. [ ] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [ ] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5.__| Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [__| has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. [__] is excused from complying because (specify):

6.[_] This action is subjectto [ __| Civil Code section 1812.10 [ Civil Code section 2984.4. 7. This court is the proper court because a. [__| adefendant entered into the contract here. . ] adefendant lived here when the contract was entered into. : a‘defendant lives here now. . [_] the contract was to be performed here. . [__] adefendant is a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. [ ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here.

. [__] other (specify):

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): [ ] Breach of Contract [x] Common Counts

[ ] Other (specify):

Q ™0 a O O

9. [__] Other allegations:

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. damagesof: $ 1,200.00

b. [ x ] interest on the damages (1) [__] according to proof (2) [x] atthe rate of (specify): 10% percent per year from (date): See Cause of Action

C. attorney’s fees (1) [x] of: $240.00 (2) [_] according to proof.

d. other (specify): All appropriate relief including costs of filing and serving complaint, Prejudgement Interest, and Attorney Fees. All documents attatched hereto are incorporated by reference as though fully set forth herein.

11. The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): All paragraphs except paragraph 5 and paragraph 7C, If checked above.

Date: 12-8-2012 Michael K. Sipes

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OFf PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

X (If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)