This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 06:27:30 (UTC).

CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU VS CHARLES K MATULA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2013 CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES K MATULA. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall of Justice and Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8802

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC

Defendant

MATULA, CHARLES K

Assignee

COLLECTO, INC. DBA EOS-CCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

SIPES, MICHAEL K

3050 Fite Circle, Suite 107

Sacramento, CA 95827

 

Court Documents

Assignment of Judgment.

Assignment of Judgment

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 7/14/15Amount: 7311.38 Comment County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 7/14/15 Amount: 7311.38

Declaration.

DECLARATION (4) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF INTEREST

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 06/02/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes on the -WITHOUT prejudice.

REQUEST Comment REQD1: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES/ROES ON THE COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Proof of Service of Complaint/Petition.

PROOF OF SERVICE Comment PS: PROOF OF SERVICE (PERSONAL) OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT OF CALIFORNIA SERVICE BUREAU INC SERVED ON CHARLES K MATULA WITH SERVICE DATE OF 01/17/13.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SIPES IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

Notice.

NOTICE (4) Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC.

Assignment of Judgment.

Assignment of Judgment

Writ of Execution Return.

Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 7/14/15Amount: 7311.38 Comment County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 7/14/15 Amount: 7311.38

Conversion Action.

WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $719.64, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 ---

Notice.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC.

Memorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $43.01, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 ---

Judgment by Clerk.

JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 06/02/14 AS FOLLOWS: Comment JDCL: JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED ON 06/02/14 AS FOLLOWS:

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF INTEREST Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF INTEREST

Declaration.

DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SIPES IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF MICHAEL K. SIPES IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY FEES

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAssignment of Judgment.; Additional Info: Assignment of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWrit of Execution Return.; Additional Info: Writ of Execution Return County: LOS ANGELESStatus: UnsatisfiedIssued on: 7/14/15Amount: 7311.38 Comment County: LOS ANGELES Status: Unsatisfied Issued on: 7/14/15 Amount: 7311.38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED. Comment WRITR: WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY RETURNED UN SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 150714-0672-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketWrit of Execution Issued.; Additional Info: Comment WEM: WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $7311.38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketConversion Action.; Additional Info: Comment CREDIT: --- CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of costs after judgment acknowledgment of credit.; Additional Info: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILE Comment MCAIC1: MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT & DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $719.64, COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 ---

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice.; Additional Info: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC. Comment N: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OR OTHER CONTACT INFORMATION FILED BY CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 140725-0047-CK 141/ 25.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2014
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment issued.; Additional Info: Comment AI1: (L) ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/02/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Case Payment Receipt # 201301020595 CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • FinancialFinancial info for CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Transaction Assessment $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • FinancialFinancial; CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU INC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketCause Of Action.; Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 01/02/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketNew Filed Case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration.; Additional Info: DECLARATION FOR REDUCTION OF FILING FEES Comment DEC: DECLARATION FOR REDUCTION OF FILING FEES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet.; Additional Info: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued / Filed.; Additional Info: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED. Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS, ISSUED AND FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • DocketConversion Minute.; Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 130102-0595-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint.; Additional Info: (S) COMPLAINT FILED Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Complaint Information

SHORTTITLE: CSB v. Charles Matula CASE NUMBER:

4. (Continued) b. The true names of defendants sued as Does are unknown to plaintiff.

(1) [__] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): were the agents or employees of the named defendants and acted within the scope of that agency or employment.

(2) [__] Doe defendants (specify Doe numbers): are persons whose capacities are unknown to plaintiff.

¢. [__] Information about additional defendants who are not natural persons is contained in Attachment 4c. d. [ ] Defendants who are joined under Code of Civil Procedure section 382 are (names):

5. Plaintiff is required to comply with a claims statute, and a. [ ] has complied with applicable claims statutes, or b. ] is excused from complying because (specify):

6.[_| This action is subjectto [___| Civil Code section 1812.10 [__] Civil Code section 2984.4. 7. This court is the proper court because a. [__| adefendant entered into the contract here. . [__] a defendant lived here when the contract was entered into. . a defendant lives here now. . [__] the contract was to be performed here. . [_] adefendantis a corporation or unincorporated association and its principal place of business is here. ] real property that is the subject of this action is located here. . [_] other (specify):

o 0 QO O

8. The following causes of action are attached and the statements above apply to each (each complaint must have one or more causes of action attached): [ ] Breach of Contract Common Counts

[ ] Other (specify):

9. [__] Other allegations:

10. Plaintiff prays for judgment for costs of suit; for such relief as is fair, just, and equitable; and for

a. [x ] damagesof:$ 3,866.56

b. [x ] interest on the damages (1) [_] according to proof (2) [x_] at the rate of (specify): 10% percent per year from (date): See Cause of Action

c. attorney's fees (1) of:$774.00 (2) [__] according to proof.

d. other (specify): All appropriate relief including costs of filing and serving complaint, Prejudgement Interest, and Attorney Fees. All documents attatched hereto are incorporated by reference as though fully set forth herein.

11. (X ] The paragraphs of this pleading alleged on information and belief are as follows (specify paragraph numbers): All paragraphs except paragraph 5 and paragraph 7C, If checked above.

Date: 12/08/2012

Michael K. Sipes

(TYPE OR PRINT NAME) (SIGNATURE OF PLAINTIFF OR ATTORNEY)

(If you wish to verify this pleading, affix a verification.)

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA SERVICEBUREAU is a litigant

Latest cases where Collecto, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIPES, MICHAEL K