This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:15:36 (UTC).

CACH VS CHARLES BENNETT

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHARLES BENNETT. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4841

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendants

CHARLES E BENNETT

BENNETT, CHARLES E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Document.

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED. Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE, FILED.

Request For Dismissal.

Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

Notice of Change of Address of Attorney.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Without Prejudice; Comment; Comment; (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request For Dismissal. Additional Info: Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Comment Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address of Attorney. Additional Info: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED Comment NCA: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF ATTORNEY RYAN E VOS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED. Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Declaration. Additional Info: Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: Comment S30: SUMMONS ISSUED; 30 DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120627-0137-CK 168/ 370.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Complaint. Additional Info: Comment COM4: (L) COMPLAINT FILED - PRAYER AMOUNT OVER $10000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206270137 CACH LLC $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial info for CACH LLC : Transaction Assessment $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2012
  • Financial: CACH LLC; Total Financial Assessment $370.00; Total Payments and Credits $370.00

    Read MoreRead Less