This case was last updated from San Mateo County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 20:14:22 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS SEUNG OH

Case Summary

On 06/26/2012 CACH, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEUNG OH. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts, Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records located in San Mateo, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4851

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Mateo County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Southern Branch Hall Of Justice And Records

  • County, State:

    San Mateo, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendants

SEUNG OH

OH, SEUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOS, RYAN E

 

Court Documents

Declaration.

DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

Document.

FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

Document.

FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

Civil Case Cover Sheet.

COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

Complaint.

COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety.

DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

Declaration.

DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

Summons Issued / Filed.

SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2013
  • Disposition: Judgment; Judgment Type; Dismissal - Other Dismissal; Party; Name: OH SEUNG; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT; Party; Name: CACH, LLC; Comment: 0001 COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (3) Comment DEC: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of - WITH prejudice in its entirety. Additional Info: DISMISSAL Comment REQDEA: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AND ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING (2) Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Document. Additional Info: FILING Comment FILED: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Cause Of Action. Additional Info: Action Complaint File Date 06/26/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • New Filed Case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION (2) Comment DECL: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REDUCED FILING FEE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration. Additional Info: DECLARATION Comment DECL: DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED BY CACH LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued / Filed. Additional Info: SUMMONS Comment S30IF: 30 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet. Additional Info: COVERSHEET Comment CCS: CIVIL CASE COVERSHEET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • Conversion Minute. Additional Info: Comment *FEE: 120628-0444-CK 132/ 181.00 PAYMT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint. Additional Info: COMPLAINT Comment COM: (S) COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Case Payment Receipt # 201206280444 CACH, LLC $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial info for CACH, LLC : Transaction Assessment $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • Financial: CACH, LLC; Total Financial Assessment $181.00; Total Payments and Credits $181.00

    Read MoreRead Less